Lemaire Illumination Technologies, LLC v. Microsoft Corporation et al
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney Gilstrap |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00729 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 15:1126 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Nov 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 02, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday May 06, 2018 4:19 AM CDT |
Defendant
Microsoft Corporation
1 Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Microsoft Mobile Inc.
6021 Connection Drive
Irving, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Microsoft Mobile Oy
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
David Folsom
dfolsom@jw.com Jackson Walker, LLP 6002-B Summerfield Drive
Texarkana, TX 75503 |
|
Plaintiff
Lemaire Illumination Technologies, LLC
14565 Grand Avenue
Burnsville, MN 55306 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, October 29, 2021 | ||
41 | 41
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 10/29 11:40 AM
Letter to Counsel. (saenz) |
|
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Mon 07/02 9:35 AM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ch, ) |
|
39 | 39
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 07/02 9:33 AM
ORDER granting38 Motion to Dismiss. Case is dismissed with prejudice in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2). Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/2/2018. (ch, ) |
|
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
motion
Dismiss
Fri 06/29 2:25 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) by Lemaire Illumination Technologies, LLC.(Massand, Neal) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Thu 05/31 8:46 AM
ORDER granting36 Motion to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/30/2018. (nkl, ) |
|
Friday, May 25, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Stay
Fri 05/25 3:18 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc., Microsoft Mobile Oy.(Smith, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 23, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Wed 05/23 3:21 PM
ORDER granting33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order and Comply with Paragraphs 1 & 3 of the Discovery Order ; granting34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order and Comply with Paragraphs 1 & 3 of the Discovery Order. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/23/2018. (ch, ) |
|
Tuesday, May 22, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Extension of Time to File
Tue 05/22 3:55 PM
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Proposed Protective Order and Comply with Paragraphs 1 & 3 of the Discovery Order by Lemaire Illumination Technologies, LLC.(Massand, Neal) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 15, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Extension of Time to File
Tue 05/15 3:46 PM
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Proposed Protective Order and Comply with Paragraphs 1 &3 of the Discovery Order by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc., Microsoft Mobile Oy. (Carraway, John) |
|
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
5
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Scheduling Order
Fri 05/11 8:17 AM
DOCKET CONTROL ORDER re30 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Docket Control Order filed by Lemaire Illumination Technologies, LLC., Pretrial Conference set for 5/6/2019 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Amended Pleadings due by 10/3/2018., Jury Selection set for 6/3/2019 09:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Mediation Completion due by 1/16/2019., Markman Hearing set for 12/19/2018 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Motions in Limine due by 4/15/2019., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/29/2019. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/10/2018. (nkl, ) |
|
31 | 31
9
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 05/11 8:10 AM
DISCOVERY ORDER granting29 Motion for Entry of Discovery Order. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/10/2018. (nkl, ) |
|
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 05/09 1:31 PM
Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Docket Control Order by Lemaire Illumination Technologies, LLC.(Massand, Neal) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
29 | 29
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 05/09 1:29 PM
Joint MOTION for Entry of Discovery Order by Lemaire Illumination Technologies, LLC.(Massand, Neal) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Mediator
Mon 04/30 9:35 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator David Folsom, Jackson Walker, L.L.P., 6002-B Summerfield Drive,Texarkana, Texas 75503, telephone number 903-255-3251, fax number 903-255-3266, and emaildfolsom@jw.com, is hereby appointed as mediator. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/27/2018. (ch, ) |
|
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Designation of Mediator
Thu 04/26 11:37 AM
NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Honorable David Folsom, filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc., Microsoft Mobile Oy. (Smith, Melissa) |
|
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 04/25 12:05 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Christopher Carraway on behalf of All Defendants (Carraway, John) |
|
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Thu 04/26 11:12 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference held on 4/24/2018. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before the United States Magistrate Judge. The Court then gave Markman and Jury Selection dates; deadlines for submitting Mediator names (3 days); and deadlines for submitting Agreed Scheduling and Discovery Orders (14 days). (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (klc, ) |
||
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 04/17 2:45 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Katarzyna Brozynski terminated. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/17/2018. (ch, ) |
|
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 04/17 2:37 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Antonio Salvador Devora terminated. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/17/2018. (ch, ) |
|
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 04/13 4:52 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Antonio Devora by Lemaire Illumination Technologies, LLC.(Devora, Antonio) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
22 | 22
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 04/13 4:49 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Katarzyna Brozynski by Lemaire Illumination Technologies, LLC.(Brozynski, Katarzyna) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 03/23 2:52 PM
ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 4/24/2018 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/23/2018. (ch, ) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Fri 02/02 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc., Microsoft Mobile Oy (Smith, Melissa) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Jury Demand
Fri 02/02 2:13 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc., Microsoft Mobile Oy. (Cleveland, Kristin) |
|
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 02/02 2:11 PM
Defendants ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc., Microsoft Mobile Oy.(Cleveland, Kristin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
17 | 17
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 02/02 1:57 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc., Microsoft Mobile Oy (Cleveland, Kristin) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Fri 02/02 1:52 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kristin L Cleveland on behalf of All Defendants (Cleveland, Kristin) |
|
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
text
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Fri 01/05 2:46 PM
Defendant Microsoft Mobile Oy's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Lemaire Illumination Technologies, LLC.( Brozynski, Katarzyna) |
|
text
Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Fri 01/05 2:48 PM
Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Microsoft Mobile Oy to 2/2/2018. 25 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) |
||
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 12/22 4:20 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lemaire Illumination Technologies, LLC. Microsoft Mobile Oy served on 12/18/2017, answer due 1/8/2018. (nkl, ) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
text
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Tue 12/19 11:16 AM
Defendant Microsoft Mobile Inc.'s Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Lemaire Illumination Technologies, LLC.( Brozynski, Katarzyna) |
|
12 | 12
text
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Tue 12/19 11:14 AM
Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Lemaire Illumination Technologies, LLC.( Brozynski, Katarzyna) |
|
11 | 11
text
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Tue 12/19 11:13 AM
Defendant Microsoft Mobile Inc.'s Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Lemaire Illumination Technologies, LLC.( Brozynski, Katarzyna) |
|
10 | 10
text
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Tue 12/19 11:12 AM
Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Lemaire Illumination Technologies, LLC.( Brozynski, Katarzyna) |
|
text
Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Tue 12/19 11:17 AM
Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Microsoft Corporation to 1/18/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) |
||
text
Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Tue 12/19 11:18 AM
Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Microsoft Mobile Inc. to 1/18/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) |
||
text
Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Tue 12/19 11:20 AM
Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Microsoft Corporation to 2/2/2018. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) |
||
text
Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Tue 12/19 11:23 AM
Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Microsoft Mobile Inc. to 2/2/2018. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) |
||
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 12/12 11:54 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lemaire Illumination Technologies, LLC. Microsoft Mobile Inc. served on 11/28/2017, answer due 12/19/2017. (ch, ) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 12/12 11:53 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lemaire Illumination Technologies, LLC. Microsoft Corporation served on 11/28/2017, answer due 12/19/2017. (ch, ) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 11/07 4:25 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neal Massand on behalf of Lemaire Illumination Technologies, LLC (Massand, Neal) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 11/07 3:09 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Antonio Salvador Devora on behalf of Lemaire Illumination Technologies, LLC (Devora, Antonio) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 11/07 3:04 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lemaire Illumination Technologies, LLC (Brozynski, Katarzyna) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Tue 11/07 3:02 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Brozynski, Katarzyna) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 11/07 2:51 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Mobile Inc., Microsoft Mobile Oy.(ch, ) |
|
Att: 1 Summons(es), | ||
Att: 2 Summons(es) | ||
2 | 2
misc
Jury Demand
Tue 11/07 2:46 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lemaire Illumination Technologies, LLC. (Brozynski, Katarzyna) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/07 2:27 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6543141.), filed by Lemaire Illumination Technologies, LLC.(Brozynski, Katarzyna) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 12 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 11/07 2:45 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) |
||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Availability
Tue 11/07 2:46 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (ch, ) |