League of United Latin American Citizens Arizona et al v. Reagan et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David G Campbell |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-04102 |
Nature of Suit | 441 Civil Rights - Voting |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 18, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday May 06, 2018 1:21 AM MST |
Defendant
Adrian Fontes
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michele Reagan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arizona Students' Association
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
League of United Latin American Citizens Arizona
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Nov 14 2018
ORDER denying 40 Motion to Compel. See Order for additional details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 11/14/2018.(DGC, nvo) |
1. | Lawsuit filed over Arizona Voter-Registration Mandates (courthousenews.com) |
Submitted Wed 11/08/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Tuesday, January 03, 2023 | ||
72 | 72
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 01/03 2:10 PM
ORDER granting70 Application to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sambo Dul is relieved of any further responsibility in connection with this action. Attorney D Andrew Gaona and Christine Bass shall continue as counsel of record for the Secretay. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 1/3/23. (DXD) |
|
71 | 71
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 01/03 1:43 PM
NOTICE re: Notice of Automatic Substitution of Public Officer by Adrian Fontes, Katie Hobbs . (Gaona, David) |
|
Wednesday, December 28, 2022 | ||
70 | 70
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 12/28 12:58 PM
EX PARTE MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney with Client Consent by Katie Hobbs.(Gaona, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |