Giant Snacks, Inc. v. Wild Dutchman Products, Inc. et al
North Dakota District Court | |
Judge: | Alice R Senechal |
Referred: | Alice R Senechal |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00242 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Nov 08, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 21, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday May 07, 2018 4:09 AM CDT |
Counter Claimant
Southern Sun, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Wild Dutchman Products, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Giant Snacks, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Southern Sun, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wild Dutchman Products, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Giant Snacks, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jan 17 2018
ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 3/5/2018 at 9:00 AM in Fargo ADR Room before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) |
1. | Sunflower seed companies reach settlement in lawsuit over labeling claims (kfgo.com) |
Submitted Thu 04/19/2018 | |
2. | Giant Snacks Inc. files lawsuit against Wild Dutchman Products for allegedly misleading consumers (kfgo.com) |
Submitted Fri 11/10/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Patent Report
Mon 05/21 4:42 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark. Form emailed to register. (lh) |
|
37 | 37
order
Order Adopting Stipulation
Mon 05/21 4:09 PM
(Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal Adopting36 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Giant Snacks, Inc. (MB) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Mon 05/21 4:28 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (lh) |
||
Friday, May 18, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 05/18 3:57 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Giant Snacks, Inc.. (Moerke, Katherine) |
|
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order
Wed 04/18 10:16 AM
(Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. The case has settled. Closing documents are due by 5/18/2018. (MB) |
|
34 | 34
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 04/18 9:41 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.: Early Settlement Conference held on 4/18/2018. Case settled. (DR# 180417-000 Giant) (BG) Modified on 4/18/2018 to add DR# (rm) |
|
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 03/06 9:16 AM
(Text Only) ORDER: Early Settlement Conference set for 4/17/2018 at 9:00 AM in Fargo ADR Room before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 03/02 11:46 AM
(Text Only) ORDER: The settlement conference set for 3/06/2018 at the U.S. Courthouse in Fargo is canceled. It shall be rescheduled at a later date and time by separate order. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) |
|
31 | 31
minutes
Status Conference
Fri 03/02 11:34 AM
(Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.: Status Conference held on 3/2/2018. (BG) |
|
30 | 30
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 03/02 9:53 AM
(Text Only) ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/2/2018 at 11:00 AM CST by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Participants to the conference call should call the telephone number and enter the access code provided by separate email. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) |
|
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
order
Protective Order
Thu 02/08 3:34 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS) |
|
28 | 28
order
Order
Thu 02/08 3:33 PM
(Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal adopting the27 Stipulation for entry of a Protective Order. (AS) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Stipulation
Tue 02/06 10:53 AM
STIPULATION for a Protective Order by Giant Snacks, Inc.. (Moerke, Katherine) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 01/17 5:04 PM
ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 3/5/2018 at 9:00 AM in Fargo ADR Room before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 01/11 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 3/12/2019 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Jury Trial set for 3/12/2019 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (Trial est. 5 days). (AS) |
|
24 | 24
5
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 01/11 3:03 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2019 at 01:30 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS) |
|
23 | 23
order
Order Reassigning Case
Thu 01/11 2:20 PM
(Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland no longer assigned to the case by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. See document filed at21 .(js) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 01/11 2:06 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 5/9/2018 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. The telephone number for chambers is 701-297-7070. (AS) |
|
21 | 21
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 01/11 2:02 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Discovery due by 8/31/2018. Discovery Motions due by 9/15/2018. Expert Discovery due by 10/31/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 2/1/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2018. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 2/1/2018. Threshold Motions due by 1/15/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 11/8/2018. (AS) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Wed 01/10 4:57 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Scheduling Conference held on 1/10/2018. (lc) |
|
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 01/05 4:38 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern Sun, LLC. (Swenson, Erik) |
|
Tuesday, December 26, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Tue 12/26 3:32 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim15 by Giant Snacks, Inc..(Moerke, Katherine) |
|
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Tue 12/26 3:31 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim13 by Giant Snacks, Inc..(Moerke, Katherine) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
5
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 12/05 10:38 AM
ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 1/10/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Mon 12/04 4:05 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Giant Snacks, Inc. by Southern Sun, LLC.(Swenson, Erik) |
|
14 | 14
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 12/04 1:22 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wild Dutchman Products, Inc. re13 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (Harrie, William) |
|
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Mon 12/04 1:21 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Answer, Counterclaim and Jury Demand of Defendant Wild Dutchman Products, Inc. , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Wild Dutchman Products, Inc..(Harrie, William) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Mon 12/04 10:32 AM
(Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Erik G. Swenson. (AS) Regenerated to Attorney Swenson on 12/4/2017. (rh) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Mon 12/04 10:13 AM
(Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Peter L. Crema. (AS) Modified on 12/4/2017 to correct attorney name. Regenerated to Attorney Crema. (rh) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (For Court Use Only)
Mon 12/04 9:59 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Erik G. Swenson (Filing fee $150, receipt number 318000108) by Southern Sun, LLC. (js) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (For Court Use Only)
Fri 12/01 3:53 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Peter L. Creme (Filing fee $150, receipt number 318000106) by Southern Sun, LLC. (js) |
|
utility
Docket Correction
Thu 11/30 2:22 PM
*RESTRICTED - FILED IN WRONG CASE* DOCKET CORRECTION re: 40 Motion to Dismiss. Clerk's Office added more complete descriptions to the attachments. (lf) Modified on 11/30/2017 to restrict access (lf) |
||
utility
Docket Correction
Thu 11/30 2:24 PM
DOCKET CORRECTION re: Docket Correction filed 11/30/2017. Docket Correction was filed in the incorrect case and has been restricted. (lf) |
||
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 11/29 8:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Corey J. Quinton on behalf of Southern Sun, LLC (Quinton, Corey) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 11/14 12:34 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Giant Snacks, Inc.. (Moerke, Katherine) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 11/14 12:31 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Giant Snacks, Inc.. Southern Sun, LLC served on 11/13/2017, answer due 12/4/2017 (Moerke, Katherine) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 11/14 12:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Giant Snacks, Inc.. Wild Dutchman Products, Inc. served on 11/13/2017, answer due 12/4/2017 (Moerke, Katherine) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
utility
Docket Correction
Thu 11/09 11:26 AM
DOCKET CORRECTION re:1 COMPLAINT. Attachment 1: Civil Cover Sheet contained an error in document. Clerks office restricted access to document and added corrected Civil Cover Sheet as Attachment 2. (js) |
||
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 11/08 3:41 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Giant Snacks, Inc. (as) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Patent Report
Wed 11/08 3:40 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark. Form emailed to register. (as) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 11/08 3:32 PM
Summons Issued as to Southern Sun, LLC, Wild Dutchman Products, Inc.. (as) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 11/08 3:29 PM
COMPLAINT against Southern Sun, LLC, Wild Dutchman Products, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 318000075) filed by Giant Snacks, Inc.(as) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |