Compassware, Inc. v. BeHealth Solutions, LLC
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Sam Sparks |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01057 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Nov 08, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 23, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday May 07, 2018 3:25 AM CDT |
Counter Defendant
Compassware, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Plaintiff
BeHealth Solutions, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BeHealth Solutions, LLC
Curl Stahl Geis, P.C. 700 N. St. Mary's Street Suite 1800
San Antonio, TX 78205 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Compassware, Inc.
Sneed, Vine & Perry, PC 108 East 8th Street
Georgetown, TX 78626 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
37 | 37
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 01/23 2:42 PM
ORDERED that the Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice #36 is GRANTED in all respects and that this lawsuit is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice, with costs to be borne by the party incurring same. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (td) |
|
Friday, January 10, 2020 | ||
36 | 36
3
pgs
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 01/10 4:01 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by BeHealth Solutions, LLC. (Hill, Herbert) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
3
pgs
notice
Notice of Settlement
Thu 07/18 12:31 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Compassware, Inc. (Sanders, Wayne) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 04/24 11:56 AM
ORDER GRANTING33 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (td) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
2
pgs
motion
Withdraw As Attorney
Thu 04/18 4:56 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Brittany M. Weil and Danielle N. Rushing, Individually, as Counsel for Defendant by BeHealth Solutions, LLC.(Hill, Herbert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Withdraw Attorneys Brittany M. Weil and Danielle N. Rushing, Individually, as Counsel for Defendant | ||
Monday, April 15, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines
Mon 04/15 4:30 PM
ORDER GRANTING31 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Discovery due by 9/17/2019, Motions due by 10/15/2019. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (td) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
5
pgs
motion
Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines
Thu 04/11 5:59 PM
Agreed MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Third Agreed Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by BeHealth Solutions, LLC.(Hill, Herbert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order Granting Third Agreed Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines | ||
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines
Fri 09/21 3:47 PM
ORDER GRANTING29 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2019, Discovery due by 6/17/2019, Joinder of Parties due by 3/15/2019, Motions due by 7/15/2019. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (td) |
|
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
5
pgs
motion
Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines
Thu 09/13 5:00 PM
Agreed MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by BeHealth Solutions, LLC.(Curl, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Proposed Order Granting Second Agreed Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines | ||
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines
Mon 04/09 9:38 AM
ORDER GRANTING26 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines; Amended Pleadings due by 9/15/2018, Discovery due by 12/17/2018, Joinder of Parties due by 9/15/2018, Motions due by 1/14/2019. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (td) |
|
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
4
pgs
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Thu 04/05 4:32 PM
Plaintiff's ANSWER to23 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Compassware, Inc..(Sanders, Wayne) |
|
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
9
pgs
motion
Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines
Tue 04/03 4:22 PM
Agreed MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by BeHealth Solutions, LLC.(Rushing, Danielle) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
4
pgs
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 03/29 11:54 AM
Defendant's ANSWER to24 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by BeHealth Solutions, LLC.(Curl, Paul) |
|
Thursday, March 15, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
4
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 03/15 4:59 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against BeHealth Solutions, LLC amending, filed by Compassware, Inc..(Sanders, Wayne) |
|
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
9
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Fri 03/09 3:57 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and , COUNTERCLAIM against Compassware, Inc. by BeHealth Solutions, LLC.(Curl, Paul) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
4
pgs
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 03/02 10:04 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Docket Call set for 5/29/2020 11:00 AM before Judge Sam Sparks, Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2018, Discovery due by 6/15/2018, Joinder of Parties due by 3/15/2018, Motions due by 7/12/2018. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (td) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Leave to File
Fri 02/23 9:32 AM
ORDER DENYING5 Motion to Dismiss; DISMISSING13 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-reply. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (td) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
notice
Notice
Thu 02/15 4:12 PM
NOTICE Concerning Reference to United States Magistrate Judge by Compassware, Inc. (Sanders, Wayne) |
|
19 | 19
3
pgs
adr
ADR Report - Other
Thu 02/15 12:46 PM
ADR Report Filed - JOINT by Compassware, Inc.(Sanders, Wayne) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
misc
Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 02/14 10:46 AM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by BeHealth Solutions, LLC. (Rushing, Danielle) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
3
pgs
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 12/21 5:15 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by BeHealth Solutions, LLC, re13 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Plaintiff Compassware, Inc.(Curl, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
3
pgs
misc
Status Report
Tue 12/19 3:51 PM
STATUS REPORT JOINT on Rule 26(F) Conference and Discovery Plan by Compassware, Inc.. (Sanders, Wayne) |
|
15 | 15
3
pgs
misc
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order
Tue 12/19 3:49 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order JOINT by Compassware, Inc.. (Sanders, Wayne) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 12/18 2:03 PM
PROPOSED ORDER re: MOTION Proposed Order re13 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Compassware, Inc.. (Sanders, Wayne) Modified on 12/18/2017 (td) |
|
13 | 13
2
pgs
motion
Leave to File Document
Mon 12/18 1:48 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Compassware, Inc..(Sanders, Wayne) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Compassware Sur-Reply | ||
utility
Notice of Correction
Mon 12/18 3:15 PM
Notice of Correction: re14 MOTION Proposed Order re13 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply . Filer selected wrong event, correction has been made. No further action is required. Please note this information for future filing purposes. (td) |
||
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Deficiency Notice
Wed 12/13 4:00 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 11 MOTION for Leave to File. (dm) |
|
11 | 11
4
pgs
motion
Leave to File Document
Wed 12/13 12:56 PM
MOTION for Leave to File REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Compassware, Inc., re5 MOTION to Dismiss Due to Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Defendant BeHealth Solutions, LLC and Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply(Sanders, Wayne) Modified on 12/13/2017 to create motion (dm) |
|
Att: 1 3 pgs Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Chris Dauw, | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A-1 - Email, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit EXhibit A-2 - Email | ||
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 12/06 6:36 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by BeHealth Solutions, LLC, re5 MOTION to Dismiss Due to Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Defendant BeHealth Solutions, LLC(Curl, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 4 pgs Exhibit A - Affidavit of Joseph L. Jennings | ||
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
5
pgs
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 11/29 4:52 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Compassware, Inc., re5 MOTION to Dismiss Due to Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Defendant BeHealth Solutions, LLC(Porter, Kathryn) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit | ||
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order
Mon 11/27 12:15 PM
Order for Proposed Scheduling Order. Plaintiff shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 1/9/2018,. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Supplement
Wed 11/15 2:11 PM
SUPPLEMENT to6 Supplement Record in the State Court by BeHealth Solutions, LLC.(Curl, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix Amended Notice of Removal | ||
6 | 6
misc
Supplement
Wed 11/15 11:26 AM
SUPPLEMENT Record in the State Court by BeHealth Solutions, LLC.(Curl, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 3 pgs Appendix Plaintiff's Original Petition, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix Citation, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix Return of Service, | ||
Att: 4 Appendix Docket Sheet | ||
5 | 5
9
pgs
motion
Dismiss
Wed 11/15 11:21 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Due to Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by BeHealth Solutions, LLC.(Curl, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A-2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A-3, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order Order of Dismissal | ||
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 11/09 3:43 PM
ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (afd) |
|
3 | 3
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 11/09 2:56 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BeHealth Solutions, LLC (Curl, Paul) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Supplement
Thu 11/09 2:45 PM
SUPPLEMENT to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet by BeHealth Solutions, LLC. (Curl, Paul) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 11/08 3:48 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BeHealth Solutions, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-10163299), filed by BeHealth Solutions, LLC.(Curl, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 11/09 3:31 PM
Case assigned to Judge Sam Sparks. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd) |