Steven Wayne Bonilla v. Ronald Davis et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dolly M Gee |
Referred: | Jean P Rosenbluth |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-08126 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Nov 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 20, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Receipt of Case by Other District (Electronic Case Transfer)
Thu 11/30 8:44 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from California Northern District, 4:17-cv-06768 filed 11/24/2017. (lom) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Transferring Case
Tue 11/21 9:47 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Judge Dolly M. Gee transferring case to Northern District of California. Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bem) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-84) (Habeas) - optional html form
Wed 11/08 10:42 AM
NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (car) |
|
Att: 1 CV-60P Form | ||
5 | 5
motion
Show Cause
Wed 11/08 10:42 AM
Expedited Review Requested. Judicial Notice Requested to Show that Order to Show Cause Was Issued filed by Petitioner Steven Wayne Bonilla. (car) |
|
4 | 4
misc
For Judicial Notice
Wed 11/08 10:33 AM
Expedited Review Requested, Judicial Notice Requested filed by Petitioner Steven Wayne Bonilla. (car) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Expedite Review
Wed 11/08 10:31 AM
Expedited Review Requested, Review and Reconsideration Motion, Newly Found Facts of Law filed by Petitioner Steven Wayne Bonilla. (car) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 11/08 10:24 AM
18 USC 4 Prison Guards Tax Fraud On the American Taxpayer filed by Petitioner Steven Wayne Bonilla. (car) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254)
Wed 11/08 10:15 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Expedited Review Requested. Judicial Notice Requested. Case assigned to Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth.(Filing fee $ 5. FEE DUE), filed by Petitioner Steven Wayne Bonilla. (car) Modified on 11/8/2017 (car) |