Everly v. Everly et al
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Aleta A Trauger |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01440 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:0101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Nov 08, 2017 |
Re-opened: | May 26, 2020 |
Terminated: | May 04, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday May 07, 2018 3:55 AM CDT |
Counter Defendant
Isaac Donald Everly
|
Represented By
|
Counter Plaintiff
Christopher Everly
|
Represented By
|
Counter Plaintiff
Patrice Y. Everly
|
Represented By
|
Counter Plaintiff
Phillip J. Everly
|
Represented By
|
Counter Plaintiff
Everly and Sons Music (BMI)
|
Represented By
|
Counter Plaintiff
The Phillip Everly Family Trust
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Christopher Everly
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Patrice Y. Everly
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Phillip J. Everly
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Everly and Sons Music (BMI)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Phillip Everly Family Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Isaac Donald Everly
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 36 minutes ago |
Wednesday, March 08, 2023 | ||
112 | 112
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 03/08 1:38 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to106 Notice of Appeal. Pursuant to the court's disposition that was filed 02/10/2023 the mandate for this case hereby issues today. (kc) |