SOSA RAMIREZ et al v. SHANGHAI TOKYO CAFE OF DC CORP. et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Emmet G Sullivan |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02430 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 07, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 09, 2018 4:44 AM EDT |
Defendant
ZHONG JIE CHEN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SHANGHAI TOKYO CAFE OF DC CORP.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOSE ALVARENGAS URVINA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOSE MONGE RAMIREZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOSE SOSA RAMIREZ
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
order
.Order
Wed 08/08 10:34 AM
MINUTE ORDER in view of15 notice of voluntary dismissal, this case is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/8/2018. (lcegs3) |
||
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 08/07 2:06 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Tucker, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, May 23, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 05/23 4:46 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties' amended pleadings due by 9/10/2018. Fact discovery shall close by 9/10/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 9/24/2018. Oppositions to dispositive motions due by 10/7/2018 Replies in support of dispositive motions due by 10/14/2018. (hmc) |
||
Tuesday, May 22, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Tue 05/22 5:17 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting14 defendants' consent motion for extension of time to complete discovery. The parties shall therefore adhere to the following schedule: parties must join additional parties or amend the pleadings by September 10, 2018; fact discovery closes on September 10, 2018; dispositive motions must be filed by September 24, 2018; oppositions to dispositive motions shall be filed by October 7, 2018; replies in support of dispositive motions must be filed by no later than October 14, 2018. The Court declines to schedule a pretrial conference or a trial date at this time. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 5/22/2018. (lcegs3) |
||
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Mon 05/21 5:49 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and other schedules by ZHONG JIE CHEN, SHANGHAI TOKYO CAFE OF DC CORP. (Chou, Bwo) |
|
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Wed 05/16 1:09 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ZHONG JIE CHEN, SHANGHAI TOKYO CAFE OF DC CORP.. Attorney Albert Wilson, Jr terminated. (Wilson, Albert) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/16 12:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Philip Tucker on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tucker, Jonathan) |
|
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
notice
Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
Tue 05/08 2:36 PM
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re11 Notice of Appearance was entered in error as a duplicate filing. (jf) |
||
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 05/07 4:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bwo Marian Chou on behalf of All Defendants (Chou, Bwo) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 05/07 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bwo Marian Chou on behalf of All Defendants (Chou, Bwo) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
order
.Order
Tue 03/27 11:42 AM
MINUTE ORDER in view of9 joint status report, in which the parties indicate that they were unable to resolve this matter in mediation, the Court hereby sets the following deadlines in this matter: (1) initial disclosures are due by April 18, 2018; (2) parties must join additional parties or amend the pleadings by July 10, 2018; (3) fact discovery closes on July 10, 2018; (4) dispositive motions must be filed by July 24, 2018; (5) oppositions to dispositive motions must be filed by August 7, 2018; (6) replies in support of dispositive motions must be filed by August 14, 2018. The Court declines to schedule a pretrial conference or a trial date at this time. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/27/2018. (lcegs3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 03/27 1:05 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Initial Disclosure due by 4/18/2018. Parties Must Join Additional Parties Or Amend Pleadings due by 7/10/2018. Fact Discovery due by 7/10/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 7/24/2018. Oppositions to Dispositive Motions due by 8/7/2018. Replies In Support Of Dispositive Motions due by 8/14/2018. (mac) |
||
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Status Report
Mon 03/26 10:31 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT Re: Failure of Mediation and Request for Scheduling Order by JOSE ALVARENGAS URVINA, JOSE MONGE RAMIREZ, JOSE SOSA RAMIREZ. (Zelikovitz, Justin) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 01/31 8:57 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Mediation to conclude by 5/1/2018. Joint Status Report due by 5/15/2018. (mac) |
||
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
order
Order Referring Case to Mediation (Circuit Executive's Office)
Tue 01/30 6:14 PM
MINUTE ORDER in view of8 response to order of the court in which parties state that they would prefer to proceed directly to ADR, this matter is hereby referred to the District Court's mediation program. It is further ordered that counsel and the parties, including persons with settlement authority, attend mediation. Mediation shall be concluded by May 1, 2018. The parties shall file a joint status report, including a recommendation for further proceedings, by no later than May 15, 2018. If this case settles in whole or part before May 15, 2018, counsel should advise the Court of the settlement by filing a stipulation. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/30/2018. (lcegs3) |
||
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Response to Order of the Court
Mon 01/29 2:02 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,, filed by JOSE ALVARENGAS URVINA, JOSE MONGE RAMIREZ, JOSE SOSA RAMIREZ. (Zelikovitz, Justin) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
order
.Order
Fri 01/19 4:23 PM
MINUTE ORDER The Court received a voicemail from plaintiffs' counsel seeking clarification regarding the Court's January 17, 2018 Minute Order. The Court clarifies that the parties are directed to indicate, by no later than January 24, 2018, whether they would prefer to (1) proceed directly to ADR before a mediator, thereby postponing discovery and obviating the need for the Court to refer this matter to a magistrate judge at this time, or (2) be referred to a magistrate judge to engage in discovery prior to proceeding to mediation. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/19/2018. (lcegs3) |
||
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
order
.Order
Wed 01/17 1:13 PM
MINUTE ORDER in view of7 parties' meet and confer statement, in which the parties state that they "believe that this case would benefit from early ADR," it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file a joint status report by February 18, 2018, indicating whether they would prefer an ADR referral at this time. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/17/2018. (lcegs3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 01/17 2:49 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/18/2018. (mac) |
||
Monday, January 15, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Meet and Confer Statement
Mon 01/15 1:10 PM
MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Zelikovitz, Justin) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 12/13 3:11 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by ZHONG JIE CHEN, SHANGHAI TOKYO CAFE OF DC CORP..(Wilson, Albert) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned as to private individual or business
Fri 12/01 4:37 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ZHONG JIE CHEN served on 11/22/2017, answer due 12/13/2017 (Zelikovitz, Justin) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned as to private individual or business
Fri 12/01 4:36 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SHANGHAI TOKYO CAFE OF DC CORP. served on 11/22/2017, answer due 12/13/2017 (Zelikovitz, Justin) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Standing Order
Fri 11/17 8:47 AM
STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/17/17. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Thu 11/16 9:56 AM
SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to ZHONG JIE CHEN, SHANGHAI TOKYO CAFE OF DC CORP. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 11/16 9:52 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zsb) |
||
Friday, November 10, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/10 11:44 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5200270) filed by JOSE SOSA RAMIREZ, JOSE ALVARENGAS URVINA, JOSE MONGE RAMIREZ.(Zelikovitz, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons |