MORRISON v. ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Claire C Cecchi |
Referred: | Leda D Wettre |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-11501 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Nov 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 13, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 09, 2018 4:48 AM EDT |
Defendant
ASTRAZENECA LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP
|
Represented By
|
In Re
PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (NO.II)
|
|
Plaintiff
DIANE MORRISON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, January 13, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
7
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Fri 01/13 10:41 AM
MDL ORDER GRANTING Motion for Summary Judgment. [ADOPTING 867 REPORT & RECOMMENDATION OF SPECIAL MASTER ELLEN K. REISMAN REGARDING Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment as to Michigan Plaintiffs filed in the Master Docket 17-MD-2789] ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED***. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 12/22/2022. (krg, ) |
|
Friday, October 01, 2021 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 10/01 2:39 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Magistrate Judge Mark Falk no longer assigned to the case. (mxw) |
||
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/11 10:12 PM
Short-Form ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND with Certificate of Service by ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP.(HINDY, GREGORY) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/02 9:42 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by DIANE MORRISON. ASTRAZENECA LP served on 1/29/2018, answer due 2/19/2018. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 02/02 9:41 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by DIANE MORRISON. ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP served on 1/29/2018, answer due 2/19/2018. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
Friday, November 10, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 11/10 4:49 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Reilly* (jr) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/10 10:43 AM
COMPLAINT against ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8248057) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DIANE MORRISON.(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 11/10 4:48 PM
Case assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. (jr) |
||
order
Case Management Order
Fri 11/10 4:50 PM
For all Case Management Orders[LINK:click here] (jr) |
||
mdl
MDL Direct File
Fri 11/10 4:53 PM
Member Case Direct File on 11/10/2017, for MDL 2789 PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (NO.II). (jr) |