Brown v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Wilhelmina M Wright |
Referred: | Franklin L Noel |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-05082 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Nov 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 09, 2018 3:40 AM CDT |
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marla Brown
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Judgment (Clerk's Office Only)
Mon 04/09 12:15 PM
JUDGMENT(lmb) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 04/09 9:33 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 4/9/2018. (TJB) |
|
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation
Wed 04/04 11:41 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re16 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Eidsness, Kyle) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 04/04 11:39 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Life Insurance Company of North America. Jointly Signed by Marla Brown. (Eidsness, Kyle) |
|
Wednesday, March 21, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Cancelation/Rescheduling of Hearing
Wed 03/21 12:03 PM
(Text-only) NOTICE of Cancelation of Hearing: The Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2018 09:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel is CANCELLED. The parties report they have settled the matter and will file a stipulation of dismissal shortly. (TMA) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Tue 02/20 10:43 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Jointly Signed by Marla Brown.(Eidsness, Kyle) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 01/31 4:44 PM
NOTICE/ORDER OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2018 09:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 1/31/18.(JDF) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Mon 01/22 9:16 AM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Life Insurance Company of North America is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Connecticut General Corporation, which is a wholly-owned subsidiary of CIGNA Holdings, Inc., which is a wholly-owned subsidiary of CIGNA Corporation. CIGNA Corporation is publicly traded. (Eidsness, Kyle) Modified text on 1/22/2018 (LPH) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 01/22 9:14 AM
ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Eidsness, Kyle) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 01/16 2:32 PM
ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO MOVE, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT re8 Stipulation. 1. Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America shall have through and including January 26, 2018, with which to move, answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint filed in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 1/12/18. (JDF) |
|
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation
Thu 01/04 1:24 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re8 Stipulation. (Eidsness, Kyle) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation
Thu 01/04 1:23 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint,6 Waiver of Service Executed For Extension of Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. Jointly Signed by Marla Brown. (Eidsness, Kyle) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 12/13 10:36 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel Keenan Ryan for Life Insurance Company of North America. Approved by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 12/13/17. (MAM) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 12/12 3:44 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 11/13/2017, answer due 1/12/2018. (Eidsness, Kyle) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident)
Tue 12/12 3:43 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5862174 filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Eidsness, Kyle) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 12/12 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Alan Eidsness on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Eidsness, Kyle) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice - WMW Practice Pointers
Tue 11/14 12:57 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's[LINK:website] . All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (TJB) |
||
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 11/13 10:52 AM
Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (JDF) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Mon 11/13 10:52 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd, 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Please use case number 17-cv-5082 WMW/FLN. (JDF) |
|
Friday, November 10, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/10 1:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-5809564) filed by Marla Brown. Filer requests summons issued. (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |