Ralpha Harold Mack, Junior v. Essex Cochran, LP et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | S James Otero |
Referred: | Rozella A Oliver |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-08230 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:405 Fair Housing Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 19, 2018 |
Last checked: Friday May 11, 2018 1:49 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Essex Cochran, LP
|
|
Defendant
Essex Portfolio, LP
|
|
Plaintiff
Ralpha Harold Mack, Junior
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United African-Asian Abilitites Club
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 23 minutes ago |
Wednesday, March 21, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Wed 03/21 8:21 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Action (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Case is closed. Other error(s) with document(s): Minute order of 3/19/18 dismissed case, docket no. 13 and a notice of settlement also on record; a proposed order should have been submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) |
|
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Mon 03/19 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Ralpha Harold Mack, Junior. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Wakefield, David) |
|
13 | 13
minutes
Show Cause Hearing - optional html form ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 03/19 2:59 PM
MINUTES OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL HEARING held before Judge S. James Otero: Plaintiffs counsel is not present. On 2/15/18, based on Plaintiffs Notice of Settlement filed 1/29/18, the Court set this matter for an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for todays date. Plaintiffs counsel not appearing for today hearing, the Court Orders this matter dismissed.(Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Carol Zuborg. (lc) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 02/15 10:30 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Notice of Settlement (ECF No.11 ), filed on 1/29/2018, indicating that this matter has settled and that they require 45 days to finalize the settlement agreement. Accordingly, the Court sets an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for on Monday, March 19, 2018 @ 8:30 a.m. The parties shall file a joint status report by March 5, 2018. If the parties file the appropriate dismissal prior to the hearings date, consistent with FRCP 41, this matter will be taken off the Court's calendar. (lom) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Settlement
Mon 01/29 9:41 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff United African-Asian Abilitites Club. (Wakefield, David) |
|
Monday, January 15, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Mon 01/15 8:42 PM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Amended Complaint/Petition9 filed by Plaintiffs Ralpha Harold Mack, Junior, United African-Asian Abilitites Club.(Wakefield, David) |
|
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Thu 12/28 1:15 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiffs Ralpha Harold Mack, Junior(Wakefield, David) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Thu 11/16 9:11 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (vcr) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 11/13 11:34 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Essex Cochran, LP, Essex Portfolio, LP. (et) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 11/13 11:30 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 11/13 11:30 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (et) |
|
Sunday, November 12, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Sun 11/12 4:51 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Ralpha Harold Mack, Junior. (Wakefield, David) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Sun 11/12 4:50 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ralpha Harold Mack, Junior, (Wakefield, David) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Sun 11/12 4:49 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ralpha Harold Mack, Junior. (Wakefield, David) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Sun 11/12 4:49 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-20811210 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Ralpha Harold Mack, Junior. (Attorney David C Wakefield added to party Ralpha Harold Mack, Junior(pty:pla))(Wakefield, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B |