Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Lisa G Beckerman |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-13228 |
Case Filed: | Nov 13, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Dec 13, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | Apr 16, 2018 |
Debtor
Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.
500 Park Ave Apt 16C
New York, NY 10022-1629 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Albert Togut
Togut Segal & Segal, LLP One Penn Plaza Suite 3335
New York, NY 10119 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 03/26/2018 4:27 PM EDT |
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Mon 11/13 3:08 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-13228 [misc,969] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12286674. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
6
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Mon 11/13 3:07 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Clifford A. Katz of Platzer, Swergold, Levine, on behalf of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Katz, Clifford) |
|
2 | 2
5
pgs
misc
Matrix
Mon 11/13 3:11 PM
Matrix /Verification of Creditor Matrix Filed by Clifford A. Katz on behalf of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Katz, Clifford) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Mon 11/13 3:12 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement . Filed by Clifford A. Katz on behalf of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Katz, Clifford) |