DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA INC v. SUTPHIN
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark E Walker |
Referred: | Charles A Stampelos |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00518 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 24, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday May 12, 2018 5:23 AM EDT |
Defendant
GLEN W SUTPHIN, JR
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA INC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
DOUGLAS JACOBSON STATE VETERANS' NURSING HOME
Terminated: 01/18/2018
|
|
Defendant
FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN'S AFFAIRS
Terminated: 01/18/2018
|
Represented By
|
1. | Lawsuit filed against Florida Department of Veteran's Affairs over access to nursing homes (wusfnews.wusf.usf.edu) |
Submitted Mon 11/20/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Saturday, March 24, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Sat 03/24 1:37 PM
ORDER CLOSING THE FILE. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 3/24/18. (pll) |
|
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 03/23 4:33 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by GLEN W SUTPHIN, JR. (BOWDEN, ALBERT) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Rule 26 Disclosures
Thu 03/01 9:29 AM
RULE 26 Disclosures by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA INC. (FILAROSKI, CURTIS) |
|
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Status Report
Mon 02/26 12:57 PM
STATUS REPORT Regarding Parties' Discovery by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA INC. (FILAROSKI, CURTIS) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 02/27 8:32 AM
Reset Deadline Re:13 Initial Scheduling Order - Status Report due by 3/28/2018 . (vkm) |
||
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 02/23 11:41 AM
ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO COMPLY WITH AGREEMENT - The parties' joint motion, ECF No. 19 , is GRANTED. The parties are directed to comply with their "Agreement Regarding Inadvertent Disclosure of Information," ECF No. [19-1]. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 2/23/2018. (cle) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 02/22 4:07 PM
MOTION Joint Motion for Entry of the Parties' Agreement Regarding Inadvertent Disclosure of Information by GLEN SUTPHIN. (BOWDEN, ALBERT) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
18 | 18
misc
Rule 26 Disclosures
Thu 02/22 2:22 PM
RULE 26 Disclosures by GLEN SUTPHIN. (BOWDEN, ALBERT) |
|
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Case Referred to Mediation
Wed 02/21 2:58 PM
SCHEDULING AND MEDI ORDER Re: 15 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting: Discovery due by 7/2/2018 . Dispositive Motions to be filed by 7/23/2018 . Bench Trial set for 11/19/2018 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE MARK E WALKER. Mediation Report due by 8/13/2018 . Case referred to mediation. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 2/21/2018. (vkm) |
|
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 02/21 2:54 PM
ORDER ACKNOWLEDGING 15 RULE 26 (f) REPORT AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE MOTION. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 2/21/2018. (vkm) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Wed 02/21 8:34 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re:15 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (vkm) |
||
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting
Tue 02/20 2:41 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (BOWDEN, ALBERT) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons
Fri 02/02 9:19 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA INC identifying Corporate Parent DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA INC for DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA INC.. (BOYER, DAVID) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 01/29 10:10 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 2/12/2018 . Status Report due by 3/1/2018 . Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/14/2018 . Discovery due by 5/29/2018 . Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/29/2018. (cle) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 01/25 12:14 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA INC. (BOYER, DAVID) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Fri 01/19 10:58 AM
ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANTS DOUGLAS JACOBSON STATE VETERANS' NURSING HOME and FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS' AFFAIRS re 10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - DOUGLAS JACOBSON STATE VETERANS' NURSING HOME and FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN'S AFFAIRS (AN AGENCY OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA) terminated. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/18/2018. (vkm) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 01/18 7:45 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA INC (FILAROSKI, CURTIS) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss
Thu 01/11 2:06 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN'S AFFAIRS, GLEN SUTPHIN. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 1/25/2018) . (BOWDEN, ALBERT) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 12/05 10:11 AM
ORDER GRANTING 7 MOTION FOR RELIEF - Defendants Glenn W. Sutphin, Jr. and the Florida Department of Veterans' Affairs shall file their responsive pleading to the Complaint on or before 1/11/2018. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/5/2017. (vkm) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 12/04 4:10 PM
MOTION re6 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Defendants' Unopposed Motion For Relief From a Mistake In The Court's December 4, 2017, Order by GLEN SUTPHIN. (BOWDEN, ALBERT) |
|
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 12/04 1:22 PM
ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT - This Court has considered, without hearing, Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. ECF No. 5 . The motion is GRANTED. Defendants Glenn W. Sutphin, Jr. and the Florida Department of Veterans Affairs shall file their responsive pleading on or before 12/8/2017. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/4/2017. (vkm) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Extend Time
Mon 12/04 11:49 AM
MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint by GLEN SUTPHIN. (BOWDEN, ALBERT) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 11/29 11:09 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA INC. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN'S AFFAIRS served on 11/20/2017, answer due 12/11/2017; GLEN SUTPHIN served on 11/20/2017, answer due 12/11/2017. (BOYER, DAVID) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 11/14 10:52 AM
Summons Issued as to DOUGLAS JACOBSON STATE VETERANS' NURSING HOME, GLEN SUTPHIN JR. (vkm) |
|
Att: 1 Summons (Barton) | ||
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 11/13 6:38 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (HEYSTEK, AMANDA) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/13 6:35 PM
COMPLAINT For Declarative and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4024289.), filed by DISABILITY RIGHTS FLORIDA INC. (HEYSTEK, AMANDA) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |