WILLIAMS et al v. JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Brian R Martinotti |
Referred: | Lois H Goodman |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-11550 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Nov 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 23, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday May 12, 2018 5:16 AM EDT |
Defendant
JANSSEN ORTHO, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON
|
Represented By
|
In Re
INVOKANA (CANAGLIFLOZIN) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
|
|
Plaintiff
SYLVIA WILLIAMS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TRACEY WILLIAMS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, October 23, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Wed 10/23 8:54 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 10/22/2019. (jmh) |
|
mdl
MDL Closed
Wed 10/23 9:15 AM
Member Case Closed on 12/23/2019 for MDL 2750. (jmh) |
||
Tuesday, October 22, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (aty)
Tue 10/22 2:08 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SYLVIA WILLIAMS, TRACEY WILLIAMS (PETOSA, FRANK) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 12/20 8:14 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by JANSSEN ORTHO, LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.(ZOGBY, MICHAEL) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 11/14 9:34 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to JANSSEN ORTHO, LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *KIM STILLMAN* (kas, ) |
|
mdl
MDL Direct File
Tue 11/14 9:33 AM
Member Case Direct File on 11/13/2017, for MDL 16-2750 Party INVOKANA (CANAGLIFLOZIN) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (kas, ) |
||
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/13 11:02 AM
COMPLAINT against JANSSEN ORTHO, LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8250441) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TRACEY WILLIAMS, SYLVIA WILLIAMS.(PETOSA, FRANK) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 11/13 3:31 PM
Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (sab,) |