ROBERTS v. JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Brian R Martinotti |
Referred: | Lois H Goodman |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-11574 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Nov 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 14, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday May 12, 2018 4:46 AM EDT |
Defendant
JANSSEN ORTHO LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON
|
Represented By
|
In Re
INVOKANA (CANAGLIFLOZIN) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
|
|
Plaintiff
RICKY DAVID ROBERTS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 08/14 1:50 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (mmh) |
||
mdl
MDL Closed
Tue 08/14 1:50 PM
Member Case Closed on 8/14/2018 for MDL 2750. (mmh) |
||
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 08/13 6:12 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by RICKY DAVID ROBERTS. (NOKES, MELINDA) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 12/20 3:40 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICKY DAVID ROBERTS. JOHNSON & JOHNSON waiver sent on 11/14/2017, answer due 1/15/2018. (NOKES, MELINDA) |
|
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 12/20 3:39 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICKY DAVID ROBERTS. JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC waiver sent on 11/14/2017, answer due 1/15/2018. (NOKES, MELINDA) |
|
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 12/20 3:38 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICKY DAVID ROBERTS. JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. waiver sent on 11/14/2017, answer due 1/15/2018. (NOKES, MELINDA) |
|
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 12/20 3:37 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICKY DAVID ROBERTS. JANSSEN ORTHO LLC waiver sent on 11/14/2017, answer due 1/15/2018. (NOKES, MELINDA) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 12/14 7:58 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON.(ZOGBY, MICHAEL) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 11/15 9:27 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *KIM STILLMAN* (kas, ) |
|
mdl
MDL Direct File
Wed 11/15 9:26 AM
Member Case Direct File on 11/13/2017, for MDL 16-2750 Party INVOKANA (CANAGLIFLOZIN) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (kas, ) |
||
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 11/14 10:38 AM
Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (sab,) |
||
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/13 6:19 PM
COMPLAINT against JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8253194) with JURY DEMAND, filed by RICKY DAVID ROBERTS.(NOKES, MELINDA) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |