Brown v. Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Referred: | James L Cott |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-08827 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332pl Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Nov 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 21, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday May 12, 2018 4:40 AM EDT |
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
2711 Centerville Road Suite 400
Wilmington, DE 19808 |
|
Defendant
Bayer OY
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Plaintiff
Wendy Brown
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, June 21, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
order
Judgment - Clerk
Thu 06/27 4:10 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: (23 in 1:17-cv-08800-PAE-JLC, 22 in 1:17-cv-08856-PAE-JLC, 24 in 1:17-cv-08778-PAE-JLC, 22 in 1:17-cv-08781-PAE-JLC, 24 in 1:17-cv-08827-PAE-JLC, 23 in 1:17-cv-08804-PAE-JLC) Memorandum & Opinion in favor of Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc, Bayer OY, Bayer Pharma AG against Alicia Thames, Andrea Robinson, Julie Gonzalez, Tina Webber, Toni E Coleman, Wendy Brown. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion & Order dated June 11, 2019, Bayer's motion for summary judgment is granted and all remaining member cases in this MDL are closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 6/21/2019)(km) |
|
Att: 1 Right to Appeal | ||
Tuesday, June 11, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
55
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Tue 06/11 1:16 PM
OPINION & ORDER re: (328 in 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bayer Oy, Bayer Pharma AG, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. For the reasons stated above, Bayer's motion for summary judgment is granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the pending motion (No. 17 MD 2767, Dkt. 328), and to enter judgment in and close all remaining member cases in this MDL. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/11/2019) **Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al.(anc) |
|
23 | 23
55
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Tue 06/11 8:55 AM
OPINION & ORDER re: (328 in 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bayer Oy, Bayer Pharma AG, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. For the reasons stated above, Bayer's motion for summary judgment is granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the pending motion (No. 17 MD 2767, Dkt. 328), and to enter judgment in and close all remaining member cases in this MDL. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/11/2019) **Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al.(anc) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 03/15 2:57 PM
ORDER granting (343) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC; granting (134) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02674-PAE-JLC; granting (119) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02694-PAE-JLC; granting (88) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02705-PAE-JLC; granting (82) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02715-PAE-JLC; granting (78) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02718-PAE-JLC; granting (81) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02737-PAE-JLC; granting (76) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02745-PAE-JLC; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02812-PAE-JLC; granting (73) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02813-PAE-JLC; granting (70) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02814-PAE-JLC; granting (68) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02816-PAE-JLC; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02819-PAE-JLC; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02821-PAE-JLC; granting (69) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02826-PAE-JLC; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02827-PAE-JLC; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02861-PAE-JLC; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02865-PAE-JLC; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02866-PAE-JLC; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02891-PAE-JLC; granting (131) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02900-PAE-JLC; granting (113) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02916-PAE-JLC; granting (62) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02943-PAE-JLC; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02945-PAE-JLC; granting (137) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02947-PAE-JLC; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02950-PAE-JLC; granting (64) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02952-PAE-JLC; granting (63) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02961-PAE-JLC; granting (63) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02962-PAE-JLC; granting (64) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02992-PAE-JLC; granting (75) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02993-PAE-JLC; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02994-PAE-JLC; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03067-PAE-JLC; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03068-PAE-JLC; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03069-PAE-JLC; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03072-PAE-JLC; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03074-PAE-JLC; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03080-PAE-JLC; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03083-PAE-JLC; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03084-PAE-JLC; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03085-PAE-JLC; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03087-PAE-JLC; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03088-PAE-JLC; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03124-PAE-JLC; granting (192) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03125-PAE-JLC; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03143-PAE-JLC; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03146-PAE-JLC; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03147-PAE-JLC; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03216-PAE-JLC; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03219-PAE-JLC; granting (84) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03231-PAE-JLC; granting (155) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03233-PAE-JLC; granting (78) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03236-PAE-JLC; granting (99) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03238-PAE-JLC; granting (83) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03240-PAE-JLC; granting (88) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03242-PAE-JLC; granting (76) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03298-PAE-JLC; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03334-PAE-JLC; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03335-PAE-JLC; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03354-PAE-JLC; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03390-PAE-JLC; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03497-PAE-JLC; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03499-PAE-JLC; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04301-PAE-JLC; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04579-PAE-JLC; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04581-PAE-JLC; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04582-PAE-JLC; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04583-PAE-JLC; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04584-PAE-JLC; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04597-PAE-JLC; granting (41) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04967-PAE-JLC; granting (42) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04981-PAE-JLC; granting (35) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-05090-PAE-JLC; granting (35) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-05138-PAE-JLC; granting (41) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-05335-PAE-JLC; granting (41) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-05338-PAE-JLC; granting (41) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-05345-PAE-JLC; granting (35) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-05762-PAE-JLC; granting (35) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-05763-PAE-JLC; granting (77) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-06638-PAE-JLC; granting (29) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-06714-PAE-JLC; granting (31) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-07149-PAE-JLC; granting (28) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-07447-PAE-JLC; granting (28) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-07449-PAE-JLC; granting (25) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-07877-PAE-JLC; granting (23) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-08399-PAE-JLC; granting (25) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-08479-PAE-JLC; granting (25) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-08487-PAE-JLC; granting (23) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-08714-PAE-JLC; granting (22) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-09698-PAE-JLC; granting (20) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-10241-PAE-JLC; granting (19) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-00349-PAE-JLC; granting (16) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-02782-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-02885-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-03784-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-03796-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-03847-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-03860-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04067-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04627-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04655-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04713-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04721-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04766-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04792-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04794-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04842-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04976-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-05698-PAE-JLC; granting (15) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-06415-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-06732-PAE-JLC; granting (19) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-07330-PAE-JLC; granting (13) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-07774-PAE-JLC; granting (13) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-08658-PAE-JLC; granting (13) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-08888-PAE-JLC; granting (13) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-08893-PAE-JLC; granting (13) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-08895-PAE-JLC; granting (17) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-08899-PAE-JLC; granting (16) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-08902-PAE-JLC; granting (12) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-09607-PAE-JLC; granting (11) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-12373-PAE-JLC. It is hereby ORDERED that Ms. Natale's Motion is GRANTED and she is hereby terminated from these actions. The Clerk is notified to terminate Ms. Natale from all further notices in these actions. So entered this 15th day of March 2019. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/15/2019) **Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al. (anc) |
|
Wednesday, October 24, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 10/25 10:05 AM
ORDER: The Court directs counsel promptly to meet and confer as to next steps in this multi-district litigation. The Court asks counsel to consider whether, as in the earlier multi-district litigation involving Mirena presided over by Judge Seibel, this case should now proceed to motions for summary judgment limited to the issue of general causation. A joint letter, setting forth the parties' proposal(s) as to next steps, is due Friday, November 9, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/24/2018)***Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al.(anc) |
|
20 | 20
156
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Wed 10/24 10:54 AM
OPINION & ORDER re: (134, 136, 138, 141, 143, 145, 147, 149, 151, 153, 155,158, 160, 162, 165, 168, 170, 172, and 175 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC) MOTIONS to exclude testimony filed by Bayer Oy, Bayer Pharma AG, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. For the foregoing reasons, the Court grants Bayer's motion to exclude the testimony of plaintiffs' seven general-causation witnesses, and denies, as potentially moot, plaintiffs' motions to exclude Bayer's 12 general-causation witnesses. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions pending at Dkts. 134, 136, 138, 141, 143, 145, 147, 149, 151, 153, 155, 158, 160, 162, 165, 168, 170, 172, and 175. An order as to next steps in this case will follow shortly. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/24/2018) **Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al.(anc) Modified on 10/24/2018 (anc) |
|
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 08/06 12:47 PM
MOTION for Robert J. Binstock to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Brianna Smith.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al.(Binstock, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Supreme Court of Texas- Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 4 Texas State Bar- Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
3
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/02 12:02 PM
ORDER: On April 9, 2018, the Court will hold "Science Day" to provide the Court with an overview of the medical, scientific, and epidemiological issues associated with the Mirena intrauterine device and intracranial hypertension in an objective format without advocacy. As previously reviewed with counsel, the Court intends Science Day to proceed in the following manner: as set forth herein. The Court has allotted the full day of April 9, 2018 for Science Day. Proceedings will begin at 9 a.m. and will include an hour-long break for lunch, and comfort breaks in the mid-morning and mid-afternoon. Court will adjourn by 5 p.m. For the parties' planning purposes, each side is allocated at least two hours in which to present. Plaintiffs will present first, and defendants will present second. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/30/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al.(ama) |
|
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 04/02 11:37 AM
ORDER: Argument on the parties' Daubert motions is scheduled for April 10 and 11 and, if necessary, April 12, 2018. Argument each day will begin at 9 a.m. There will be an hour-long lunch break. The Court expects to adjourn each day at 5 p.m. On March 23, 2018, the parties proposed a sequence as to the topics to be covered at argument. See Dkt. 151. The Court hereby approves that proposed sequence. The Court does not, however, adopt the rigid allocation of 30 minutes time for argument as to each expert, as individual experts may merit more or less time. For avoidance of doubt, the Court is persuaded that argument is merited on both sides' Daubert motions-those directed at plaintiffs' experts and those directed at Bayer's experts. While the Court is hopeful that argument will be completed by the end of the day on April 11, 2018, the parties are to continue to reserve April 12, 2018 in the event that additional time is needed. SO ORDERED., ( Oral Argument set for 4/10/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/30/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al.(ama) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 02/28 6:12 PM
ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' joint letter (Dkt. 130) setting forth the parties' alternative proposals for the format of the April 9 Science Day proceedings. The Court's views are as follows: The Court does not wish to hear from counsel on Science Day. The purpose of Science Day is to educate the Court about scientific and medical matters, to assist the Court in understanding the science of medicine relevant to this overall case. The Court instead wishes to hear expert presentations, i.e., by physician(s) and/or scientist(s). The Court envisions that such presentations would each take the form of an expert tutorial/lecture as to background scientific questions, supported by a Power Point and/or other demonstrative visuals; and as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/28/2018)***Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al.(anc) |
|
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 02/28 5:10 PM
ORDER with respect to (129) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC. The Court has received Bayer's motion to dismiss without prejudice for failure to submit a plaintiff fact sheet. See Dkt. 129. Pursuant to CMO 12 VI, paragraph 18, there is no action for the Court to take at this time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/28/2018)***Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al. (anc) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 02/20 10:11 AM
ORDER: The Court sets a new conference on Friday, March 9, 2018 at 2:30 p.m. to discuss this plan and in particular to hear from counsel as to, inter alia, the manner in which the Science Day primer is to be conducted. The Court asks counsel to meet and confer promptly in the hope of developing jointly a plan to present a neutral primer on the relevant points. The next conference in this case, presently scheduled for Monday, February 26, 2018-which the Court had intended to use for this purpose but which can no longer so serve given that the parties opening briefs will now be filed after that date-will remain on the calendar for the time being, in the event counsel have issues to take up. The parties are to notify the Court by noon Wednesday, February 21, 2018 if they believe the conference is no longer necessary. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 3/9/2018 at 02:30 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/20/2018)***Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al.(anc) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 01/17 5:02 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (120 in 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC) Letter filed by Bayer Oy, Bayer Pharma AG, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The Court adjourns the case management conference to February 26, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/17/2018)***Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al.(anc) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 12/12 3:11 PM
ORDER: The Court has received the parties' joint letter of yesterday (Dkt. 61) proposing to adjourn the status conference scheduled for December 18, 2017, because there are no issues for the Court to resolve. The Court adjourns this conference, and commends counsel on productively working together. The Court schedules a next status conference for Friday, January 26, 2018, at 1 p.m., to be used to resolve any issues that have by then arisen, and as further set forth in this order. (Status Conference set for 1/26/2018 at 1:00 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/12/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al. and 17mc2767 (ap) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 11/27 4:48 PM
ORDER: The conference scheduled for Friday, December 1, 2017 is hereby adjourned. The Court schedules the next conference in this case for Monday, December 18, 2017 at 2:30 p.m. The parties are directed to file, five business days before the next conference, a joint letter informing the Court whether there are any issues ripe for resolution and if so, what the parties' respective positions on those issues are. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 12/18/2017 at 02:30 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/27/2017) **Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al.(anc) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 11/20 2:00 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. (Per chambers instructions) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 06/23/2017) (sjo) |
|
utility
Case Accepted as Related
Tue 11/14 4:07 PM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (bcu) |
||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Tue 11/14 4:09 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 11/14 4:09 PM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (bcu) |
||
utility
Case Consolidation - MDL
Mon 11/20 1:55 PM
CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC. (sjo) |
||
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Tue 11/14 10:33 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bayer OY. (sj) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Tue 11/14 10:31 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bayer Pharma AG. (sj) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Tue 11/14 10:29 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (sj) |
|
6 | 6
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 11/13 5:14 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bayer OY, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Wendy Brown. (Rockstad, Trevor) |
|
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 11/13 5:13 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bayer Pharma AG, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Wendy Brown. (Rockstad, Trevor) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 11/13 5:13 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Wendy Brown. (Rockstad, Trevor) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Statement of Relatedness
Mon 11/13 5:10 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 17-md-2767. Document filed by Wendy Brown.(Rockstad, Trevor) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 11/13 5:09 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rockstad, Trevor) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/13 5:09 PM
COMPLAINT against Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer OY, Bayer Pharma AG. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14358429)Document filed by Wendy Brown.(Rockstad, Trevor) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 11/14 10:20 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 11/14 10:20 AM
Case Designated ECF. (sj) |
||
utility
Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
Tue 11/14 10:21 AM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Engelmayer as possibly related to 1:17md2767. (sj) |