HAWLEY v. POWELL
Pennsylvania Middle District Court | |
Judge: | John E Jones, III |
Referred: | Karoline Mehalchick |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-02082 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Nov 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 30, 2019 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 30, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendations
Tue 07/30 11:53 AM
ORDER 1. The Report and Recommendation (Doc. 24) of Magistrate JudgeSchwab is ADOPTED in its entirety.2. This matter is DISMISSED and the Clerk of Court shall CLOSE thefile on this case (eo) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Report and Recommendations
Fri 07/12 4:14 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re3 Complaint filed by Antonio J. Hawley. Objections to R&R due by 7/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karoline Mehalchick on 7/12/2019. (cw) |
|
Wednesday, May 22, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Report and Recommendations
Wed 05/22 1:38 PM
ORDER 1. The Report and Recommendation (Doc. 22) of Magistrate JudgeSchwab is ADOPTED in its entirety.2. Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 19) is GRANTED andPlaintiffs complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.3. Plaintiff is directed to FILE an amended complaint by or before June28, 2019. Failure to timely file an amended complaint will result inthe immediate dismissal of this action.4. This matter is REMANDED to Magistrate Judge Mehalchick. for allfurther pretrial management.(eo) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Report and Recommendations
Mon 04/08 11:29 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint in Part filed by Lacey, Boston, Smith, Powell - Based on the foregoing, it is respectfully recommended that: 1. Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 19) be GRANTED, as the complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6); 2. Plaintiff be granted leave to file an amended complaint, that clarifies the bases of his claims and cures the pleading deficiencies outlined herein, within thirty (30) days upon the disposition of this Report and Recommendation; and 3. The matter be referred back to the undersigned. Objections to R&R due by 4/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karoline Mehalchick on 4/8/2019. (cw) |
|
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 02/22 1:04 PM
ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint in Part . Brief in Opposition due by 3/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karoline Mehalchick on 2/22/2019. (cw) |
|
Monday, January 07, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions)
Mon 01/07 11:14 AM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint in Part filed by Boston, Lacey, Powell, Smith.(Yaninek, John) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Dismiss
Mon 01/07 11:11 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint in Part by Boston, Lacey, Powell, Smith.(Yaninek, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, December 11, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 12/11 2:35 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to C/O Smith, waiver sent on 11/30/2018, answer due 1/29/2019. (bg) |
|
Monday, December 10, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 12/10 10:17 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Smith. Smith waiver sent on 11/7/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Clayberger, Matthew) |
|
16 | 16
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 12/10 10:16 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Boston. Boston waiver sent on 11/7/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Clayberger, Matthew) |
|
15 | 15
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 12/10 10:14 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Lacey. Lacey waiver sent on 11/7/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Clayberger, Matthew) |
|
14 | 14
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 12/10 10:11 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Powell. Powell waiver sent on 11/7/2017, answer due 1/8/2018. (Clayberger, Matthew) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
Mon 12/10 10:10 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Clayberger on behalf of Boston, Lacey, Powell, Smith (Clayberger, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
service
Waiver of Service Unexecuted
Tue 11/20 2:36 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to C/O Powell. (bg) |
|
11 | 11
service
Waiver of Service Unexecuted
Tue 11/20 2:35 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Sgt. Lacey. (bg) |
|
Thursday, November 15, 2018 | ||
order
Verbal Order Reassigning Case
Thu 11/15 10:20 AM
VERBAL ORDER by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner - Case Reassigned to Honorable John E. Jones, III. Honorable Richard P. Conaboy no longer assigned to the case. (jw) |
||
Wednesday, November 07, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
service
Waiver of Service Forms Sent (AO 398 and 399) to Defendants
Wed 11/07 1:08 PM
Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Mailed to Boston, Lacey, Powell, Smith Waiver of Service due by 12/7/2018. (ao) |
|
Tuesday, November 06, 2018 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 11/06 3:37 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Doc. 9 & 10 Deleted as filed incorrectly. Will be refiled. (cw) |
||
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Tue 10/09 2:45 PM
Summons Issued as to Powell and provided TO U.S. MARSHAL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (cw) |
|
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order Directing USM to Serve Summons and Complaint
Tue 10/09 2:45 PM
ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karoline Mehalchick on 11/6/2018. (cw) |
|
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Wed 03/14 3:54 PM
ORDER denying7 Motion to Appoint Counsel Signed by Magistrate Judge Karoline Mehalchick on 3/14/2018 (cw) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appoint Counsel
Tue 11/21 2:53 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Antonio J. Hawley.(ep) |
|
6 | 6
order
Standing Practice Order
Mon 11/13 3:04 PM
STANDING PRACTICE ORDER informing the parties of their briefing and other responsibilities. Signed by Honorable Richard P. Conaboy on 11/13/2017.(ve) |
|
Att: 1 285 Service Packet with IFP Notice | ||
5 | 5
misc
Pro Se Letter Issued
Mon 11/13 2:49 PM
PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (ve) |
|
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Mon 11/13 2:46 PM
Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 5:17-cv-04878 containing electronic documents. (ve) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
3 | 3 COMPLAINT against POWELL, filed by ANTONIO J. HAWLEY.(ky, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2017.] | |
2 | 2 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER FORTHWITH THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 11/7/17. 11/7/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE' AND FORWARDED TO MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PA. (ky, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS FILED BY ANTONIO J. HAWLEY. AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF THE APPLICATION.(mas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Request for Attorney | ||
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ANTONIO J. HAWLEY. (mas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2017.] |