Taylor v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
West Virginia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph R Goodwin |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-04311 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Nov 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 07, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 19, 2019 6:53 PM EDT |
Defendant
Ethicon, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wanda Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, November 08, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 11/08 1:36 PM
ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca) (ADI) |
|
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
13
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case - MDL
Tue 08/07 1:16 PM
ORDER TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS WITHOUT PREJUDICE (PURSUANT TO PTO NO. 293 AS AMENDED BY PTO NO. 298 - NON-REVISION GYNECARE PRODUCTS) The Ethicon defendants are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to the provisions of the Non-Revision PTOs and, in any case on Exhibit A where the Ethicon defendants are the only remaining defendants, the case is STRICKEN from the active docket; and for any case listed on Exhibit A that resides in the Ethicon MDL and names other MDL defendants other than the Ethicon defendants, plaintiffs shall file a Motion to Transfer MDLs within four (4) weeks of the entry of this Order. This Order is linked to the Proposed Order to Dismiss filed at ECF No. 6504 in MDL 2327. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/7/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (klc) (ADI) |
|
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
ETHICON - Election Form
Mon 07/09 12:58 PM
NON-REVISION ELECTION FORM: Dismissing the presently pending case without prejudice pursuant to the Pretrial Order; filed by Wanda Taylor. (Skikos, Matthew) |
|
Friday, May 18, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Pretrial Order
Fri 05/18 5:53 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER # 298 FIRST AMENDED ORDER REGARDING DISPOSITION OF NON-REVISION GYNECARE TVT PRODUCTS CASES This amended order revises certain future deadlines and addresses filing instructions regarding the Ethicon Election Form; the Order has been amended at paragraphs 2-5, paragraph 8(B)-(H), and Exhibit B; however, the remainder of this Order is substantively identical to PTO No. 293; if a plaintiff has already filed her Ethicon Election Form pursuant to the deadlines imposed by PTO No. 293, she is not required to re-file an Election Form; if an Election Form has not been filed it must be filed in each individual member case no later than 7/10/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/15/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on the Second Amended Exhibit A) (lca) (ADI) |
|
Thursday, May 10, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Thu 05/10 5:44 PM
ORDER (CHANGE TO CHARACTERIZATION BY CLERK'S OFFICE OF CASES ON INACTIVE DOCKET) It is directed that in all cases with an inactive docket order which resulted in "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flags on the docket sheet, the Clerk is directed to update the docket by removing the "Closed" flag from the docket sheet and leaving the "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flag, for reasons set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Member Cases Flagged "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive") (mek) (ADI) |
|
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Pretrial Order
Tue 04/17 2:52 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER # 293 ORDER REGARDING DISPOSITION OF NON-REVISION GYNECARE TVT PRODUCTS CASES The Motion filed at ECF No. 5313 in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Order Regarding Disposition of Non-Revision Gynecare TVT Products Cases is GRANTED; each Non-Revised Plaintiff identified on the Second Amended Exhibit "A", together with any of her derivative plaintiffs with an existing MDL lawsuit, shall file an election form (Exhibit B to this Order) in each individual case no later than 6/10/2018; the deadlines for discovery and trial preparation procedures are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/11/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on the Second Amended Exhibit A) (kp) (ADI) |
|
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 03/30 6:04 PM
ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 8/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/16/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (lca) (ADI) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
MDL Order Moving Case To Inactive Docket
Fri 02/02 4:44 PM
INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the Plaintiff(s) and Defendants have agreed to a mutual stay of activity. All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to retire this case from the active docket. If the case has not been dismissed or does not have a motion to reinstate to the active docket filed with the court for consideration by 3/31/2018, it will be reinstated to the active docket by order of the court with a shortened Docket Control Order. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 5225 in MDL Case No. 2327 Ethicon. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/2/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (brn) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice Of Attorney Appearance - ETHICON, INC. MDL CASE ONLY
Thu 11/30 4:26 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice Of Attorney Appearance - ETHICON, INC. MDL CASE ONLY
Thu 11/30 12:46 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice Of Attorney Appearance - ETHICON, INC. MDL CASE ONLY
Wed 11/29 3:40 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice Of Attorney Appearance - ETHICON, INC. MDL CASE ONLY
Mon 11/27 4:43 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Pretrial Order 274 - ETHICON MDL MEMBER CASE ONLY
Mon 11/13 2:42 PM
TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 274 (Appointing Cathy Yanni as Settlement Master for Private Settlement Agreement Between Ethicon and Certain Plaintiffs' Counsel) entered on 10/16/2017 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (crg) |
|
Friday, November 10, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/13 10:04 AM
SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-6094627. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kab) |