Jordan v. USA
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Marcia A Crone |
Referred: | Kimberly C Priest Johnson |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00797 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate/Correct Illegal Sentence |
Case Filed: | Nov 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 16, 2019 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, May 16, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
order
Judgment
Fri 05/17 8:58 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT. The Court having considered Movant's case and rendered its decision by opinion issued this same date, it is ORDERED that the Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody (#1) pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255 is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 5/16/2019. (daj, ) |
|
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Fri 05/17 8:56 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for10 Report and Recommendations. ORDERED that the Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody (#1) pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255 is DENIED, and the case is DISMISSED with prejudice. A certificate of appealability is DENIED. All motions by either party not previously ruled upon are DENIED. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 5/16/2019. (daj, ) |
|
Monday, May 06, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Mon 05/06 4:39 PM
OBJECTION to10 Report and Recommendations by Tracy Renea Jordan.(daj, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope(s) | ||
Wednesday, April 24, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
service
Acknowledgment of Receipt
Wed 04/24 4:09 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Tracy Renea Jordan as to10 Report and Recommendations. (daj, ) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Report and Recommendations
Mon 04/15 9:48 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Tracy Renea Jordan. It is recommended that the Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody (#1) pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255 be denied and the case be dismissed with prejudice. It is further recommended that a certificate of appealability be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 4/15/2019. (baf, ) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 03/20 9:06 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CIVIL CASES. It is hereby ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636 and the Local Rules of this Court for the Assignment of Matters to Magistrate Judges, the Court hereby REASSIGNS the following cases to the Hon. Kimberly C. Priest Johnson for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 3/19/2019. (daj, ) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 03/20 9:08 AM
Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak no longer assigned to the case. (daj, ) |
||
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
respoth
Response to Non-Motion
Mon 08/06 5:06 PM
Petitioner's Reply to5 Government's Response to Motion, by Tracy Renea Jordan.(kls, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope(s) | ||
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 06/26 1:57 PM
ORDER - GRANTING6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to government's answer. It is further ORDERED that Movant's request to supplement and/or amend her 28 U.S.C. § 2255 motion is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 6/26/2018. (baf, ) |
|
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 06/25 3:30 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to5 Response, by Tracy Renea Jordan.(kls, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope(s) | ||
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
respoth
Response to Non-Motion
Thu 03/22 10:26 AM
RESPONSE to1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255),3 Order to Answer,, (ts) filed by USA . (Jackson, Alan) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 03/22 10:23 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alan Reeve Jackson on behalf of USA (Jackson, Alan) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order to Answer
Fri 01/26 2:05 PM
ORDER TO ANSWER. ORDERED the Clerk of Court deliver a copy of the Section 2255 motion (Dkt. #1) upon Camelia Elisa Lopez, Assistant United States Attorney. ORDERED the Assistant United States Attorney, on behalf of the United States of America, shall have sixty (60) days from the receipt of this Order to answer the motion in full compliance with 28 U.S.C. § 2255 and to show cause why the relief prayed for should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 1/26/2018. (daj, ) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 11/13 3:02 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone and Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (daj, ) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate referral | ||
1 | 1
mot2255
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)
Mon 11/13 3:00 PM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Tracy Renea Jordan.(daj, ) |
|
Att: 1 Brief in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope(s) |