Ani Ghazaryan v. Babgen Shabazian et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John A Kronstadt |
Referred: | Suzanne H Segal |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-08245 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Nov 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 12, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday May 12, 2018 2:38 AM PDT |
Defendant
Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Ani Ghazaryan
an individual 6450 Olcott Street
Tujunga, CA 91042 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Babgen Shabazian
Terminated: 11/13/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, December 11, 2018 | ||
51 | 51
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 12/11 3:20 PM
ORDER Re Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii)50 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp) |
|
Thursday, December 06, 2018 | ||
50 | 50
stip
Dismiss Case
Thu 12/06 1:23 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) With Prejudice filed by defendant Suntrust Mortgage, Inc..(Chua, Allison) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |