Charmaine Prater v. City of Philadelphia Health D, et al
Original Case: 2:16-cv-01976
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-03468 |
Type | civil / private / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Case Filed: | Nov 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 02, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 03, 2018 4:28 AM EDT |
Defendant
DEBRA G. SPEYER, Esquire
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DARNELL WILKERSON
|
|
Defendant
THOMAS STOREY
|
|
Defendant
HOLLOWAY
|
|
Defendant
RITA EBURUOH
|
|
Defendant
ROBIN DOE
|
|
Defendant
CITY OF PHILADELPHIA HEALTH DISTRICTS, AKA Free Clinic
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
DEBRA G. SPEYER, Esquire
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JANE DOE HOLLOWAY
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
DR. THOMAS STOREY
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
RITA EBURUOH, Street Director of Doctors
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
ROBIN DOE, RN
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
DARNELL WILKERSON, Director of Staff MSW
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
CITY OF PHILADELPHIA HEALTH DISTRICTS, AKA Free Clinic
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHARMAINE PRATER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ELLA MASSARD PRATER, Incompetent mother et al
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - dismissed_USCA
ELLA MASSARD PRATER, Incompetent mother et al
|
Docket last updated: 04/03/2018 4:28 AM EDT |
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TYW) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Ella Massard Prater and Ms. Charmaine Prater in District Court No. 2-16-cv-01976. (TYW) | ||
Att: 1 4 pgs Civil Case Docketed | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs District Court Memorandum | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs District Court Order | ||
Att: 4 2 pgs Case Opening Letter | ||
Att: 5 1 pgs Caption | ||
Att: 6 1 pgs Standing Order | ||
1 pgs OSEI ORDER SENT informing Appellant Ms. Charmaine Prater that a party cannot represent another party in this Court. Notice of Appeal must be signed by all Appellants and returned to Clerk's Office. (TYW) |