Ward v. Nancy J. S. Smith, Trust
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Leslie E Kobayashi |
Referred: | Kevin Sc Chang |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00556 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Violation of Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 13, 2018 |
Last checked: Friday May 11, 2018 10:31 PM HST |
Defendant
Nancy J. S. Smith, Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Esther Ward
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM HST |
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Stipulation for Dismissal and Order
Tue 03/13 8:49 AM
STIPULATION For Dismissal With Prejudice Of All Claims And All Parties and Order signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI submitted on behalf of Defendant Nancy J. S. Smith, Trust. (eps, ) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
minutes
1 - Terminate Hearings
Wed 02/28 2:50 PM
EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 3/2/18 @ 9:00 a.m. is taken off calendar. Counsel advised that this case has been settled. The deadline to file the dismissal document is 4/9/18.. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
minutes
2 - Set Hearings
Fri 02/16 8:57 AM
EO: Pursuant to Counsel's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 2/21/18 @ 9:00 a.m. is continued to 3/2/2018 @ 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Parties notified. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 01/19 8:33 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eileen C. Zorc on behalf of Nancy J. S. Smith, Trust on behalf of Nancy J. S. Smith, Trust. (Zorc, Eileen) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
minutes
2 - Set Hearings
Mon 01/08 2:35 PM
EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 2/2/18 @ 9:00 a.m. is continued to 2/21/2018 @ 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
minutes
2 - Set Hearings
Wed 01/03 1:27 PM
EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 1/8/18 @ 9:00 a.m. is continued to 2/2/2018 @ 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Mr. Phillips notified. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 12/15 11:46 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS Returned Executed by Esther Ward. Nancy J. S. Smith, Trust served on 12/13/2017. (emt, ) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Civil Waiver of Service Packet
Mon 11/13 12:47 PM
CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (emt, ) |
|
Att: 1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, | ||
Att: 2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Rule 16
Mon 11/13 12:40 PM
Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00AM on 1/8/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/13/2017. (emt, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL) |
|
Att: 1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 11/13 12:35 PM
Summons Issued as to Nancy J. S. Smith, Trust. (emt, ) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Mon 11/13 12:30 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 17-00556 LEK-KSC on all further pleadings . (emt, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/13 11:45 AM
COMPLAINT against Nancy Smith Trust ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-1955929.), filed by Esther Ward.(Phillips, Lunsford) |
|
Att: 1 Summons |