Partida v. United States of America et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Sheri Polster Chappell |
Referred: | Carol Mirando |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00618 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Nov 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 08, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
transfer
Division transfer out
Thu 02/08 2:58 PM
TRANSFER to Ocala Division and assigned case number 5:18-cv-61-Oc-10PRL (SLU) |
|
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order transferring case to another division
Thu 02/08 2:05 PM
ORDER transferring case to Ocala. New Case Number is 5:18-cv-61-Oc-10PRL. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/8/2018. (SLU) Modified on 2/8/2018 to edit docket text (SLU) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 02/05 2:14 PM
Case reassigned to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. New case number: 2:17-cv-618-FtM-38CM. Judge Unassigned Judge no longer assigned to the case. (laf) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on motion for leave to proceed In forma pauperis
Mon 01/08 1:42 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must complete this Court's Affidavit of Indigency and attach a certified copy of his prisoner trust account within TWENTY-ONE days of the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in Plaintiff's case being dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 1/8/2018. (SLU) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Related case order and track 1 notice
Thu 11/16 2:51 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/30/2017. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/16/2017. (jmc) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Standing order pro se litigants
Wed 11/15 9:01 AM
STANDING ORDER for all confined, pro se litigants. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/15/2017. (SLU) |
|
4 | 4
order
Standing Order re: 25 pages
Wed 11/15 9:00 AM
STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/15/2017. (SLU) |
|
3 | 3
3
pgs
order
Order
Wed 11/15 8:59 AM
ORDER regarding prisoner consent form and financial certificate. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/15/2017. (SLU) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 11/14 10:59 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard Partida.(SLU) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/14 10:56 AM
COMPLAINT against Lieutenant Brown, Warden Jarvis, FNU Lipps, United States of America filed by Richard Partida. (no service copies)(SLU) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope |