Davis v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Catherine M Salinas |
Referred: | Catherine M Salinas |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-04550 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Nov 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 19, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Judgment - Clerk
Wed 09/19 12:16 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT ENTERED that the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security is hereby affirmed, and this action be, and the same hereby is dismissed. (bdb) |
|
13 | 13
9
pgs
order
Order on Social Security Appeal
Wed 09/19 12:15 PM
ORDER Affirming the decision of the Commissioner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 9/19/2018. (bdb) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Wed 09/19 12:18 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (bdb) |
||
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Fri 06/08 11:40 AM
Submission of10 Order Directing Social Security Briefing to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (jkl) |
||
Monday, April 30, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
respoth
Social Security Defendants Brief
Mon 04/30 12:09 PM
Social Security Defendants Brief. by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 5/14/2018. (Powell, R.) |
|
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
respoth
Social Security Plaintiffs Brief
Mon 04/02 1:17 PM
Social Security Plaintiffs Brief by Melody Davis. Defendant Brief due by 5/2/2018. Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 5/16/2018. (Rogers, David) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
3
pgs
order
Order Directing Social Security Briefing
Fri 03/02 2:42 PM
ORDER Directing Social Security Briefing schedule. Plaintiff Brief due by 4/2/2018. Defendant Brief due by 5/2/2018. Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 5/16/2018. At the close of the described briefing schedule, the undersigned will review the file and all submissions and schedule oral arguments if it appears that they will be helpful to the resolution of the issues presented. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 3/2/2018. (bdb) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Memo to Magistrate Judge Requesting HHS Briefing Schedule
Fri 03/02 7:55 AM
Memo to Magistrate Judge Requesting HHS Briefing Schedule. (bdb) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Social Security Transcript
Thu 03/01 4:38 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Commissioner of Social Security Administration..(Powell, R.) |
|
Att: 1 Complete Certified Transcript | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 03/01 4:37 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Powell, R.) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
8
pgs
order
Order Staying Case
Mon 01/22 4:15 PM
ORDER STAYING CASE ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER STAYING CIVIL PROCEEDINGS IN LIGHT OF LAPSE OF APPROPRIATIONS Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 1/22/18. (bnw) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Return of Service Executed as to Social Security Administration
Tue 11/28 3:42 PM
Return of Service Executed by Melody Davis. Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 11/20/2017, answer due 2/28/2018.(Rogers, David) |
|
Att: 1 Summons SSA Regional, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Attorney General | ||
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
misc
Clerks Notification of Reassignment per S.O.07-02
Thu 11/16 4:44 PM
CLERK'S Notification of Reassignment to US Magistrate Judge Pursuant to Standing Order 07-02 re: Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas for all further proceedings. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:17-cv-04550-CMS. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (sap) |
||
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Tue 11/14 3:21 PM
Submission of1 Complaint for Review, submitted to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (eop) |
||
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Tue 11/14 4:24 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Melody Davis. (Rogers, David) |
||
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Tue 11/14 3:20 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Attorney General, U. S. Department of Justice.(eop) |
|
3 | 3
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Tue 11/14 3:18 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to The General Counsel, Social Security Administration. (eop) |
|
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Tue 11/14 3:14 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (eop) Modified text on 11/14/2017 (eop) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/14 3:12 PM
COMPLAINT, filed by Melody Davis; and Summon(s) issued. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-7502914.)(eop) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |