Bryant et al v. Rons et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sam R Cummings |
Referred: | Rebecca Rutherford |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-03121 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 12:1819 Default of Promissory Note |
Case Filed: | Nov 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 17, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday May 12, 2018 4:22 AM CDT |
Defendant
Dustin Adams
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tanya De Lucas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sharon Hopkins
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gabriel Paiz
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Emona Rons
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank National Association
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ark Dimension 5 Trust
|
|
Plaintiff
Metatron International Trust
|
|
Plaintiff
Bruce Howard Bryant
Trustee Bruce Howard Bryant Ark Dimension 5 Trust 300 Trois Lane
Fredricksburg, TX 78624 |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, January 17, 2019 | ||
41 | 41
order
Judgment
Thu 01/17 11:59 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT: That Plaintiff take nothing on their claims asserted against Wells Fargo Bank National Association. This Judgment fully and finally resolves Plaintiff's claim against the named Defendant in this civil action. The claims asserted against Wells Fargo Bank National Association are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All claims asserted against Defendants Gabriel Paiz, Sharon Hopkins, Tanya De Lucas, Emona Rons, Dustin Adams are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 1/17/2019) (zkc) |
|
40 | 40
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 01/17 11:55 AM
ORDER granting38 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Wells Fargo Bank National Association is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from this civil action. Further, Dustin Adams is not a named Defendant within Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS that Mr. Adams be removed as a named Defendant in this civil action. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 1/17/2019) (zkc) |
|
Friday, September 28, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Fri 09/28 12:51 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association re38 MOTION to Dismiss (Alexander, Tatiana) |
|
38 | 38
motion
Dismiss
Fri 09/28 12:49 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association (Alexander, Tatiana) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | ||
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 09/14 11:01 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs filed by Bruce Howard Bryant. (One or more defendant(s) is no longer named.) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Bryant, Bruce) |
|
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
2
pgs
order
Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Fri 09/07 10:58 AM
Order Accepting35 Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff's29 Motion to Release Parties and Defendants'16 Motion to Dismiss are GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within 21 days from the date of this Order. Plaintiff's28 First Motion for Summary Judgment is premature and DENIED. If Plaintiff failes to timely amend his complaint, the Court will convert its dismissal to a dismissal with prejudice and enter a final judgment accordingly. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 9/7/2018) (zkc) |
|
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Fri 08/24 11:03 AM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE on Motion: The Court should GRANT Plaintiff's Motion to Release Parties [ECF No.29 ] and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [ECF No.16 ], and DISMISS without prejudice all of Plaintiff's claims and causes of action. The Court should allow Plaintiff 21 days from the date of any order accepting these Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation in which to file an amended complaint and should order that if Plaintiff fails to do so, all of his claims will be dismissed with prejudice without further notice. In view of the recommended disposition of Plaintiff's claims, the Court should DENY Plaintiff's First Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF No.28 ]. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 8/23/2018) (ykp) |
|
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Show Cause
Fri 08/24 10:51 AM
ORDER denying24 Motion for Order to Show Cause. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 8/23/2018) (ykp) |
|
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 07/03 11:16 PM
MOTION rebuttable to motion to dismiss parties re32 Response/Objection filed by Bruce Howard Bryant (Bryant, Bruce) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
respm
Response/Objection
Tue 06/19 12:09 PM
RESPONSE filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association re:29 MOTION (Alexander, Tatiana) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order of Dismissal | ||
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Wed 06/06 11:34 AM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association re30 Response/Objection to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Alexander, Tatiana) |
|
30 | 30
respm
Response/Objection
Wed 06/06 11:33 AM
RESPONSE filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association re:28 First MOTION for Summary Judgment (Alexander, Tatiana) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment | ||
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Continue
Tue 05/29 9:40 AM
MOTION to Continue filed by Bruce Howard Bryant (Bryant, Bruce) |
|
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 05/17 5:27 PM
First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bruce Howard Bryant with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Bryant, Bruce) |
|
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Response/Objection
Wed 04/25 3:57 PM
RESPONSE filed by Bruce Howard Bryant re:24 MOTION for Order to Show Cause (Bryant, Bruce) |
|
Friday, April 20, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Response/Objection
Fri 04/20 10:06 AM
RESPONSE filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association re:24 MOTION for Order to Show Cause (Alexander, Tatiana) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order Denying Motions | ||
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 03/30 11:20 AM
***DUPLICATE FILING***MOTION TO SHOW CAUSE of24 MOTION TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Bruce Howard Bryant. (ctf) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Show Cause
Fri 03/30 11:16 AM
MOTION TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Bruce Howard Bryant. (ctf) |
|
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Reply
Mon 03/19 12:14 PM
REPLY filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association re:16 MOTION to Dismiss (Alexander, Tatiana) |
|
Saturday, March 03, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Reply
Sat 03/03 9:54 AM
REPLY filed by Bruce Howard Bryant re:16 MOTION to Dismiss (Bryant, Bruce) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
service
Summons Returned
Fri 03/02 11:53 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Wells Fargo Bank National Association ; served on 3/1/2018. (Bryant, Bruce) |
|
20 | 20
service
Summons Returned
Fri 03/02 11:50 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Dustin Adams ; served on 3/1/2018. (Bryant, Bruce) |
|
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 02/27 9:05 AM
ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff Bruce Bryant's correspondence to the Court, filed on February 12 and 20, 2018 [ECF Nos.15 &18 ]. Plaintiff is advised that the Court is in receipt of these filings and that no further action is needed at this time, other than Plaintiff's response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [ECF No.16 ] which is due by March 5, 2018. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 2/26/2018) (ndt) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 02/20 2:22 PM
Correspondence to the court regarding case filed by Bruce Howard Bryant (ykp) |
|
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 02/14 4:14 PM
Proof of Service for Subpoena served on Megan S Clinefelter on 2/5/2018. (aaa) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss
Mon 02/12 5:16 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association with Brief/Memorandum in Support.Attorney Tatiana Alexander added to party Wells Fargo Bank National Association(pty:dft) (Alexander, Tatiana) |
|
Att: 1 Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order of Dismissal | ||
15 | 15
misc
Administrative Record
Mon 02/12 2:38 PM
Administrative Record consisting of LETTER TO JUDGE filed by Bruce Howard Bryant. (Bryant, Bruce) |
|
Sunday, February 04, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
discov
Joint Submission on Discovery Matters
Sun 02/04 3:01 PM
First Joint Submission on Discovery Matters subpoenea request for documents by Bruce Howard Bryant. (Bryant, Bruce) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Mon 01/29 10:38 AM
SPECIAL ORDER NO. 3-316: All matters referred to Magistrate Judge Stickney are automatically referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford unless otherwise directed by the presiding district judge. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 1/26/2018) (ctf) |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned
Wed 01/24 11:34 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Emona Rons ; served on 1/22/2018. (Bryant, Bruce) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned
Wed 01/24 11:33 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Gabriel Paiz ; served on 1/22/2018. (Bryant, Bruce) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned
Wed 01/24 11:31 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Sharon Hopkins ; served on 1/22/2018. (Bryant, Bruce) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned
Wed 01/24 11:27 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Tanya De Lucas ; served on 1/22/2018. (Bryant, Bruce) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Amended Document
Tue 12/05 5:04 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Bruce Howard Bryant. corrected exhibt A . (Bryant, Bruce) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Affidavit
Tue 12/05 10:48 AM
Truth Affidavit re5 MOTION for Writ by Bruce Howard Bryant. (ykp) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Tue 12/05 10:42 AM
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to5 Motion for Writ by Plaintiff Bruce Howard Bryant. (ykp) (Main Document 6 replaced on 12/5/2017) (ykp) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Writ
Mon 11/20 2:46 PM
Request for clerk to accept bond and issue Writ of Replevin filed by Bruce Howard Bryant. (axm) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 11/14 4:30 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Tue Nov 14 16:30:13 CST 2017 (crt) |
||
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 11/14 4:29 PM
Summons Issued as to Dustin Adams, Tanya De Lucas, Sharon Hopkins, Gabriel Paiz, Emona Rons, Wells Fargo Bank National Association. (ykp) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/14 4:02 PM
COMPLAINT against Dustin Adams, Tanya De Lucas, Sharon Hopkins, Gabriel Paiz, Emona Rons, Wells Fargo Bank National Association filed by Ark Dimension 5 Trust, Metatron International Trust, Bruce H Bryant. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number DS104108) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ykp) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Tue 11/14 3:57 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (ykp) |
|
1 | 1
qcref
Cummings (Dallas)
Tue 11/14 3:56 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Stickney (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp) |