Alfred et al v. Walt Disney Company, The et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Philip A Brimmer |
Referred: | S Kato Crews |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02729 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Nov 14, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Sep 14, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 14, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday May 13, 2018 3:31 AM MDT |
Defendant
ABC, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Walt Disney Compnay
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walt Disney Theatrical Recordings
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walt Disney Parks and Resorts Worldwide
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walt Disney Motion Pictures Group, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walt Disney Attractions Technology, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Disney Store USA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Disney Interactive Studios, Inc,
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Disney Enterprises, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Disney Consumer Productions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Disney Consumer Productions and Interactive Media, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Disney Book Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Buena Vista Video On Demand
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Buena Vista Theatrical Group, LTD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Buena Vista Theaters, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Buena Vista Productions
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Buena Vista Non- Theatrical, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Buena Vista Media
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Buena Vista Home Entertainment, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Buena Vista Catalogue Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Buena Vista Books, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arthur Lee Alfred, II
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ezequiel Martinez, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tova Laiter
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
57 | 57
misc
Transmittal of Documents - Interdistrict
Mon 09/17 2:45 PM
Interdistrict Transmittal of Documents via e-mail to InterdistrictTransfer_CACD@cacd.uscourts.gov. Text Only Entry. (sphil, ) |
|
56 | 56
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 09/17 2:26 PM
ORDER by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 09/14/2018, re:46 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue is GRANTED in part. ORDERED that, pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 1404(a), this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Central District of California. (sphil, ) |
|
order
~Util - Case Reopened
Mon 09/17 2:31 PM
Case reopened due to docketing error, re:56 Order. Text Only Entry. (sphil, ) Modified on 9/17/2018 to add docket text. (sphil, ) |