Jay Thomas v. Commissioner Social Security
Original Case: 2:16-cv-03392
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-03456 |
Type | civil / united states as party / social security |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Case Filed: | Nov 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 12, 2018 3:29 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
COMMISSIONER SOCIAL SECURITY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JAY L. THOMAS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/12/2018 3:29 AM EST |
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SB) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Jay L. Thomas in District Court No. 2-16-cv-03392. (SB) | ||
Att: 1 2 pgs Notice of Appeal | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs District Court Order | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Case Caption | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs Standing Order Excess Pagination | ||
Att: 5 2 pgs Case Opening Letter | ||
Document in Support of Appeal. Certificate of Service dated 11/13/2017. Service made by US mail. (SB) |