FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC et al v. AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Esther Salas |
Referred: | Michael A Hammer |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-11680 |
Nature of Suit | 835 Property Rights - Patent – Abbreviated New Drug Application |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Nov 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 10:13 PM EDT |
Counter Claimant
AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS PRIVATE LIMITED
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
ALLERGAN USA, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
FOREST LABORATORIES HOLDINGS LIMITED
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
PIERRE FABRE MEDICAMENT S.A.S.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS PRIVATE LIMITED
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ALLERGAN USA, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FOREST LABORATORIES HOLDINGS LIMITED
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PIERRE FABRE MEDICAMENT S.A.S.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, November 25, 2020 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 11/25 10:56 AM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion no longer assigned to the case. (jc, ) |
||
Thursday, December 27, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
order
Stipulation and Order
Thu 12/27 2:54 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER; etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 12/20/2018. (sms) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Thu 02/15 3:44 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim by ALLERGAN USA, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES HOLDINGS LIMITED, FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, PIERRE FABRE MEDICAMENT S.A.S..(WALSH, LIZA) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Fri 02/09 9:27 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (sr, ) |
||
utility
Create Case Association
Fri 02/09 9:28 AM
Cases associated: Create association to 2:17-cv-10230-ES-SCM. (sr, ) |
||
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
9
pgs
order
Order
Fri 02/09 9:23 AM
ORDER consolidating cv-11680,cv 17-11679 cv 17-10140 cv-10273,cv-10321,cv-10330 with cv 17-10230 for all purposes, and shall be captioned as "In re: Fetzima". All previously scheduled Rule 16 conferences are vacated, and an initial conference in the consolidated actions shall be conducted before Judge Steven C. Mannion, U.S.M.J., on March 7, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 2/8/18. (sr, ) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Fri 02/02 11:43 PM
Letter from Liza M. Walsh Regarding Consent Order for Consolidation and Joint Rule 16 Conference. (WALSH, LIZA) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 01/25 11:44 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS PRIVATE LIMITED. (CONROY, REBEKAH) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Thu 01/25 11:42 AM
DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to Complaint and , COUNTERCLAIM against ALLERGAN USA, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES HOLDINGS LIMITED, FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, PIERRE FABRE MEDICAMENT S.A.S. by AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS PRIVATE LIMITED, AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC.(CONROY, REBEKAH) |
|
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Stipulation and Order
Fri 12/29 2:57 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT; that the time for Defendants to answer or otherwise move in response to the Complaint is hereby extended up to and including January 25, 2018.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 12/29/2017. (ld, ) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Letter
Fri 12/22 5:00 PM
Letter from All Parties.(CONROY, REBEKAH) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 12/22 4:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by REBEKAH R. CONROY on behalf of AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS PRIVATE LIMITED (CONROY, REBEKAH) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Acknowledgment of Service
Tue 12/12 1:06 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by PIERRE FABRE MEDICAMENT S.A.S., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, ALLERGAN USA, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES HOLDINGS LIMITED. AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS PRIVATE LIMITED served on 12/12/2017, answer due 1/2/2018. (WALSH, LIZA) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 11/17 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ELEONORE OFOSU-ANTWI on behalf of ALLERGAN USA, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES HOLDINGS LIMITED, FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, PIERRE FABRE MEDICAMENT S.A.S. (OFOSU-ANTWI, ELEONORE) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 11/17 1:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by PIERRE FABRE MEDICAMENT S.A.S., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, ALLERGAN USA, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES HOLDINGS LIMITED. AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC served on 11/16/2017, answer due 12/7/2017. (WALSH, LIZA) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 11/16 11:13 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS PRIVATE LIMITED Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *CHRISTINE MELILLO* (cm, ) |
|
4 | 4
misc
AO120 Patent/Trademark Form
Thu 11/16 11:11 AM
AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (cm, ) |
|
Att: 1 complaint | ||
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 11/15 8:12 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by PIERRE FABRE MEDICAMENT S.A.S.. (WALSH, LIZA) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 11/15 8:12 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALLERGAN USA, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES HOLDINGS LIMITED, FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC. (WALSH, LIZA) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 11/15 8:11 PM
COMPLAINT against AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS PRIVATE LIMITED ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8260548), filed by PIERRE FABRE MEDICAMENT S.A.S., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, ALLERGAN USA, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES HOLDINGS LIMITED.(WALSH, LIZA) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-E, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 AO120 Form | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 11/16 11:03 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. (ak, ) |