Hartman v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-12533 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Nov 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 08, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday May 14, 2018 3:40 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bayer AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Ortho LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Research & Development LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Company
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Donald Hartman
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, September 08, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 09/08 10:13 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice- originally filed as rec. doc. 17806 in master case 14-md-2592. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/13/2020.(dw) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, November 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
30+
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Fri 11/24 1:38 PM
PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #31. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(ADI) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 11/17 10:51 AM
Summons Issued as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Pharma AG.(ss) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Thu 11/16 8:12 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 11/15 4:29 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6474281) filed by Donald Hartman.Attorney Michael T. Gallagher added to party Donald Hartman(pty:pla).(Gallagher, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons |