Consumer Financial Protection Bureau v. Think Finance
Montana District Court | |
Judge: | Brian Morris |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00127 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Nov 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 07, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday May 14, 2018 3:00 AM MDT |
Defendant
Think Finance
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Financial U, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TC Administrative Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TC Decision Sciences, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TC Loan Service, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tailwind Marketing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Think Finance SPV, LLC
|
Represented By
|
In Re
Think Finance SPV, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
|
Represented By
|
1. | The Consumer Financial Protection Bureau files lawsuit against Think Finance () |
Submitted Wed 11/22/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
108 | 108
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT
Fri 02/07 9:36 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel: Steven A. Ellis withdrawing from the case, filed by Think Finance (Ward, Leo) |
|
Thursday, February 06, 2020 | ||
107 | 107
14
pgs
order
Order on Stipulated Motion - MT
Thu 02/06 10:08 AM
STIPULATED FINAL CONSENT ORDER regarding106 Stipulated Motion. (PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/6/2020. (MMS) |
|
Wednesday, February 05, 2020 | ||
106 | 106
motion
Stipulation Motion - MT
Wed 02/05 10:53 AM
Unopposed Stipulated Motion for Entry of a Stipulated Final Consent Order Benjamin Vaughn appearing for Plaintiff Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (Vaughn, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Attachment A - Stipulated Final Consent Order |