Dollar et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
West Virginia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph R Goodwin |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-04335 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Nov 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 04, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 19, 2019 8:56 PM EDT |
Defendant
Ethicon, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Dollar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna Dollar
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, June 04, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
6
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case - MDL
Tue 06/04 10:53 AM
ORDER (Dismissing Ethicon Defendants without Prejudice) granting the Joint Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice filed in MDL 2327, the Ethicon defendants are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE from the action(s) listed on the attached Exhibit(s); and if there are no remaining defendants in a civil action, then (a) that civil action is dismissed without prejudice and stricken from the docket and (b) any pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/4/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on the attached Exhibit(s)) (kab) (ADI) |
|
Thursday, November 08, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 11/08 1:40 PM
ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca) (ADI) |
|
Friday, August 31, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
MDL Order Moving Case To Inactive Docket
Fri 08/31 2:38 PM
INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and Ethicon, Inc. have reached a settlement. The court ORDERS as follows: All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to place this case on the pending inactive docket. Plaintiff(s) and defendant(s) may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 10/31/2018; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiff(s) and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. The court will reinstate the case to the active docket if one of the parties show good cause for such reinstatement. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 6604 in MDL Case No. 2327 Ethicon. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/31/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kp) (ADI) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice Of Attorney Appearance - ETHICON, INC. MDL CASE ONLY
Fri 04/06 12:24 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Halli D. Cohn on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Cohn, Halli) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice Of Attorney Appearance - ETHICON, INC. MDL CASE ONLY
Fri 04/06 11:50 AM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by S. Eric Rumanek on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rumanek, S.) |
|
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/26 10:33 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson re:8 Notice to Take or Amend Deposition (Gage, William) |
|
Thursday, March 15, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
ETHICON - Plaintiff Fact Sheet
Thu 03/15 10:25 AM
PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Donna Dollar. (Moreland, W.) |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice To Take Or Amend Deposition
Thu 02/01 4:36 PM
NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. James J. Bendell on 3/5/18 at 9:00 a.m. (Combs, Philip) |
|
Monday, January 15, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
ETHICON - Plaintiff Profile Form
Mon 01/15 2:38 PM
PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Donna Dollar. (Moreland, W.) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice Of Attorney Appearance - ETHICON, INC. MDL CASE ONLY
Tue 12/19 2:00 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice Of Attorney Appearance - ETHICON, INC. MDL CASE ONLY
Fri 12/15 1:27 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice Of Attorney Appearance - ETHICON, INC. MDL CASE ONLY
Fri 12/15 11:53 AM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice Of Attorney Appearance - ETHICON, INC. MDL CASE ONLY
Fri 12/08 11:32 AM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Pretrial Order 274 - ETHICON MDL MEMBER CASE ONLY
Fri 11/17 4:02 PM
TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 274 (Appointing Cathy Yanni as Settlement Master for Private Settlement Agreement Between Ethicon and Certain Plaintiffs' Counsel) entered on 10/16/2017 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (crg) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 11/16 3:38 PM
SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-6103732. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (brn) |