JOHNSON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney W Sippel |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-02724 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Nov 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 24, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 15, 2018 4:10 AM CDT |
Defendant
Merck & Co, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Merck Sharp & Dohme
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
N.V. Organon
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Organon USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Schering Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JENNIFER JOHNSON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, October 24, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case)
Thu 10/24 4:47 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. SO ORDERED. Case terminated. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/24/2019. (KXS) |
|
Tuesday, October 22, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation
Tue 10/22 11:56 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to all Defendants by Defendants Merck & Co, Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme, N.V. Organon, Organon USA, Inc., Schering Corporation. (Yoo, Thomas) |
|
Tuesday, May 21, 2019 | ||
misc
NextGen Remark
Tue 05/21 2:25 AM
NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:[LINK:https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf.] If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found[LINK:https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf.] If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or[LINK:moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov] . (CSAW) |
||
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 01/24 9:45 AM
ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses of Defendants by Merck & Co, Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme, N.V. Organon, Organon USA, Inc., Schering Corporation.(Geist, Melissa) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 01/11 3:45 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by JENNIFER JOHNSON. Organon USA, Inc. served on 1/3/2018, answer due 1/24/2018. (Krangle, David) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 01/11 3:45 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by JENNIFER JOHNSON. Schering Corporation served on 1/3/2018, answer due 1/24/2018. (Krangle, David) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 01/11 3:45 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by JENNIFER JOHNSON. N.V. Organon served on 1/3/2018, answer due 1/24/2018. (Krangle, David) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 01/11 3:44 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by JENNIFER JOHNSON. Merck Sharp & Dohme served on 1/3/2018, answer due 1/24/2018. (Krangle, David) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 01/11 3:43 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by JENNIFER JOHNSON. Merck & Co, Inc. served on 1/3/2018, answer due 1/24/2018. (Krangle, David) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY)
Thu 11/16 2:31 PM
Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:17-cv-10967. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.(DLB) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order of MDL Transfer
Thu 11/16 12:59 PM
Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the Easter District of Missouri. (gh, ) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MERCK & CO., INC, MERCK SHARP & DOHME, N.V. ORGANON, ORGANON USA, INC., SCHERING CORPORATION Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *ELISAVETA KALLUCI* (ek) | |
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against MERCK & CO., INC, MERCK SHARP & DOHME, N.V. ORGANON, ORGANON USA, INC., SCHERING CORPORATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8226188) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JENNIFER JOHNSON.(KRANGLE, DAVID) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (eu, ) |