Shadpour v. Facebook, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Phyllis J Hamilton |
Case #: | 5:14-cv-00307 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 21, 2014 |
Terminated: | Apr 15, 2014 |
Last checked: Thursday Jan 22, 2015 6:07 AM PST |
Defendant
Facebook, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Shadpour
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 11, 2014 | ||
13 | 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' FILING OF CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RELATED CASE DEADLINES AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting (16) Stipulation in case 4:13-cv-05996-PJH; granting (12) Stipulation in case 4:14-cv-00307-PJH (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014) | |
Thursday, March 06, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Plaintiffs' Filing Of Consolidated Amended Complaint And Related Case Deadlines, filed by Facebook, Inc., David Shadpour. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 3/6/2014) Modified on 3/7/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). | |
Tuesday, February 11, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/27/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/3/2014 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/11/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014) | |
Tuesday, February 04, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Jon A Tostrud (Tostrud, Jon) (Filed on 2/4/2014) | |
9 | 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on 2/4/14. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014) | |
Monday, February 03, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 ORDER RELATING CASE. C 14-307 PSG AND C 13-5996 PJH ARE RELATED. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/3/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014) | |
Thursday, January 30, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by David Shadpour. Service waived by Facebook, Inc. waiver sent on 1/27/2014, answer due 3/28/2014. (Glancy, Lionel) (Filed on 1/30/2014) | |
Wednesday, January 22, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014) | |
5 | 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/6/2014. Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose.. Signed by Judge Grewal on 1/22/14.(srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014) | |
Att: 1 Standing Order | ||
Tuesday, January 21, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014) | |
3 | 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by David Shadpour (Glancy, Lionel) (Filed on 1/21/2014) | |
2 | 2 Proposed Summons. (Glancy, Lionel) (Filed on 1/21/2014) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Facebook, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8310679.). Filed byDavid Shadpour.(Glancy, Lionel) (Filed on 1/21/2014) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |