Cater v. State Of New York et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert W Sweet |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-09032 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e-2e Job Discrimination (Unlawful Employment Practices) |
Case Filed: | Nov 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 06, 2019 |
Last checked: Thursday May 17, 2018 4:39 AM EDT |
Defendant
Empire State Development Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
State Of New York
Office of the Attorney General 120 Broadway
New York, NY 10271 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Governor Andrew Cuomo
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
William Ballard Hoyt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Marie Cater
|
Represented By
|
1. | N.Y. Ignored Sex-Harassment Claims Against Ex-Cuomo Aide, Says State Worker's Suit (wsj.com) |
Submitted Mon 11/20/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, February 06, 2019 | ||
64 | 64
order
Judgment - Clerk
Wed 02/06 11:49 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re:63 Memorandum & Opinion. in favor of Empire State Development Corporation against Lisa Marie Cater. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasonsstated in the Court's Opinions dated January 30 and February 4, 2019, Defendants' motion to dismiss the Plaintiff's claims is granted with prejudice because amending the complaint again would be futile in light of the enforceable Settlement Agreement that bare Plaintiff's claims; because the Amended Complaint fails to allege cognizable causes of action against ESD, as set forth in the Court's Opinion dated February 4, 2019, Plaintiff's First, Fifth, Sixth, Seventh, and Eight Causes of Action against ESD are dismissed, with prejudice. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 02/06/2019)(dt) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Right to Appeal | ||
Monday, February 04, 2019 | ||
63 | 63
21
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Mon 02/04 6:22 PM
OPINION re:39 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Empire State Development Corporation. Based upon the conclusions set forth below, the motion is granted and the Amended Complaint is dismissed. Because the Amended Complaint fails to allege cognizable causes of action against ESD, as set forth above, Plaintiff's First, Fifth, Sixth, Seventh, and Eighth Causes of Action against ESD are dismissed, with prejudice. It is so ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/4/2019) (ne) |
|
62 | 62
24
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Mon 02/04 5:52 PM
OPINION re:45 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by William Ballard Hoyt. For the reasons set forth above Defendant's motion to dismiss the Plaintiff's claims is granted with prejudice because amending the complaint again would be futile in light of the enforceable Settlement Agreement that bars Plaintiff's claims. It is so ordered. William Ballard Hoyt ((In his individual capacity) ) terminated. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/30/2019) (ne) |