Williams v. McDonough et al
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Amos L Mazzant, III |
Referred: | Kimberly C Priest Johnson |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00811 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Nov 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 22, 2022 |
Last checked: Friday May 18, 2018 3:45 AM CDT |
Defendant
Keith D Martin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
April Dawn McDonough
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Denton County, Texas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Denton, Texas City of
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melvin Earl Williams, Jr
|
Represented By
|
1. | Denton man files lawsuit alleging police Taser projectile left him blind in left eye (dentonrc.com) |
Submitted Thu 01/18/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
137 | 137
appeal
USCA Judgment
Mon 04/24 3:38 PM
USCA JUDGMENT (certified copy): IT IS ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Appellant pay to Appellees the costs on appeal to be taxed by the Clerk of this Court as to132 Notice of Appeal filed by Melvin Earl Williams, Jr. Issued as mandate on 4/24/2023.(rpc, ) |
|
Att: 1 USCA Opinion, | ||
Att: 2 USCA Cover Letter |