Hepner et al v. Deja Vu Services, Inc. et al
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert H Cleland |
Referred: | Elizabeth A Stafford |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-13760 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Nov 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 02, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 16, 2018 5:00 AM EDT |
Defendant
D V Saginaw, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Deja Vu Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paola Canas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Cozzens
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mariana Davalos
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hillary Hepner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marketa Kazdova
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rachel Koren
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ursula Mayes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lucy Pinder
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tiffany Selby
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tiffany Toth Gray
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Katarina Van Derham
|
Represented By
|
1. | Lawsuit filed against Deja Vu strip club alleging it used 11 women's photos without consent (mlive.com) |
Submitted Wed 11/22/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, January 02, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
order
Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order
Wed 01/02 4:54 PM
STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice and without costs Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag) |
|
Friday, September 28, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice - Other
Fri 09/28 5:00 PM
NOTICE by All Defendants of Pending Settlment (Hoffer, Matthew) |
|
notice
Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled
Fri 09/28 1:42 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Settlement Conference on 10/5/18 is Cancelled re27 Notice to Appear (MarW) |
||
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Appear*
Tue 09/18 11:17 AM
NOTICE TO APPEAR: Settlement Conference set for 10/5/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford . (MarW) Modified on 9/18/2018 (MarW) |
|
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
notice
Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled
Mon 09/17 11:47 AM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Trial Documents Deadline, Final Pretrial Conference on 12/17/2018 AND trial on 1/7/2019 are Cancelled (LWag) |
||
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines
Tue 09/11 1:16 PM
ORDER DENYING without prejudice24 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and/or for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings filed by D V Saginaw, LLC, Deja Vu Services, Inc. and setting a new ( Dispositive Motion Cut-off for 12/15/2018 ) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag) |
|
25 | 25
order
Referring Other Matters to Magistrate Judge*
Tue 09/11 1:08 PM
STIPULATED ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge Stafford : Settlement Conference. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag) |
|
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Fri 09/07 2:29 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Robert H. Cleland: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/7/2018 (LWag) |
||
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Partial Summary Judgment
Tue 09/04 11:52 PM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and/or for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings by All Defendants. (Hoffer, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Laurie Bowers w Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Karen Gay, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Table of Images | ||
Wednesday, August 29, 2018 | ||
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 08/29 5:36 PM
RESET - Set Deadlines/Hearings: TELEPHONIC Status Conference re-set for 9/7/2018 10:00 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland 9THE COURT WILL INITIATE THE CALL (LWag) |
||
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Appear*
Fri 08/24 4:18 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference re: Magistrate Judge Referral set for 9/6/2018 10:00 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland (LWag) |
|
22 | 22
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines
Fri 08/24 4:12 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending the Close of Discovery, ( Discovery due by 10/31/2018 ) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag) |
|
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines
Wed 06/06 3:04 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Discovery Cutoff, ( Discovery due by 10/1/2018 ) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag) |
|
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
order
Protective Order
Tue 05/29 1:11 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag) |
|
Friday, May 18, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Order
Fri 05/18 2:55 PM
ORDER Terminating as Moot15 Motion for Protective Order and DIRECTING the parties to submit a joint proposed protective order no later that 5/25/2018. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag) |
|
Thursday, May 10, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 05/10 10:39 PM
RESPONSE to15 MOTION for Order for Entry of Protection with Withdrawal of Opposition filed by All Defendants. (Hoffer, Matthew) |
|
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 05/10 12:46 PM
ORDER regarding mediation. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag) |
|
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 05/10 12:46 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Robert H. Cleland: Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/8/2018 (LWag) |
||
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Appear*
Tue 05/01 2:45 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 5/8/2018 03:30 PM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland (LWag) |
|
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
For Order
Thu 04/26 7:25 PM
MOTION for Order for Entry of Protection by Paola Canas, Kimberly Cozzens, Hillary Hepner, Marketa Kazdova, Rachel Koren, Ursula Mayes, Lucy Pinder, Tiffany Selby, Tiffany Toth Gray, Katarina Van Derham. (Mann, Jonas) |
|
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
trial
Witness List
Wed 03/07 9:01 PM
Preliminary WITNESS LIST by All Defendants (Hoffer, Matthew) |
|
13 | 13
trial
Witness List
Wed 03/07 5:34 PM
PRELIMINARY WITNESS LIST by Paola Canas, Kimberly Cozzens, Mariana Davalos, Hillary Hepner, Marketa Kazdova, Rachel Koren, Ursula Mayes, Lucy Pinder, Tiffany Selby, Tiffany Toth Gray, Katarina Van Derham (Mann, Jonas) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 02/21 11:06 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/1/2018 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 9/4/2018 Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2018 02:00 PM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland Jury Trial set for 1/7/2019 09:00 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Thu 02/15 12:06 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Robert H. Cleland: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 2/15/2018 (LWag) |
||
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Discovery Plan - Rule 26f
Thu 02/08 7:27 PM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Tellis, Roland) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Appear*
Thu 01/25 11:59 AM
NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 2/15/2018 11:00 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland (LWag) |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Wed 01/24 9:26 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by D V Saginaw, LLC (Hoffer, Matthew) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Wed 01/24 9:25 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Deja Vu Services, Inc. (Hoffer, Matthew) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 01/24 9:15 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Hoffer, Matthew) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Appearance
Wed 01/24 9:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley J. Shafer on behalf of All Defendants. (Shafer, Bradley) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Appearance
Wed 01/24 9:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Hoffer on behalf of All Defendants. (Hoffer, Matthew) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Appearance
Mon 11/20 1:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonas P. Mann on behalf of Paola Canas, Kimberly Cozzens, Mariana Davalos, Hillary Hepner, Marketa Kazdova, Rachel Koren, Ursula Mayes, Lucy Pinder, Tiffany Selby, Tiffany Toth Gray, Katarina Van Derham. (Mann, Jonas) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued*
Mon 11/20 10:32 AM
SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DWor) |
|
notice
Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option
Mon 11/20 10:33 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (DWor) |
||
Saturday, November 18, 2017 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Edmund S. Aronowitz on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Aronowitz, Edmund) | |
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT filed by Paola Canas, Ursula Mayes, Lucy Pinder, Rachel Koren, Tiffany Toth Gray, Katarina Van Derham, Tiffany Selby, Mariana Davalos, Hillary Hepner, Kimberly Cozzens, Marketa Kazdova against D V Saginaw, LLC, Deja Vu Services, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6485010 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Charleston, SC - County Where Action Arose: Shiawassee - County of 1st Defendant: Shiawassee. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Tellis, Roland) | |
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |