Herrington v. Janssen Research & Development LLC, et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-13039 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Nov 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 11, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday May 21, 2018 4:10 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Ortho LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Research & Development LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bayer AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Herrington
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, September 11, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 09/11 10:51 AM
ORDER Dismissing Case with Prejudice - originally filed as rec. doc. 17829 in master case 14-md-2592. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/9/2020. (caa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, November 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
30+
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Fri 11/24 2:08 PM
PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #31. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(ADI) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 11/24 8:26 AM
Summons Issued as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson.(mmv) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons | ||
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 11/22 11:34 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 11/22 10:50 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6486643) filed by Pamela Herrington.Attorney Jennifer A. Lenze added to party Pamela Herrington(pty:pla).(Lenze, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Bayer Pharma AG, | ||
Att: 3 Summons BHCP, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Janssen Ortho LLC, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., | ||
Att: 6 Summons Janssen Research & Development, LLC, | ||
Att: 7 Summons Johnson & Johnson Company |