Jahkur-Muhammad v. Kroger Texas L.P.
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Thad Heartfield |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00496 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Nov 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 20, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday May 21, 2018 4:54 AM CDT |
Defendant
Kroger Texas LP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Najah Jahkur-Muhammad
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 11/20 10:19 AM
ORDER granting14 Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. All costs will be taxed against the party incurring same. Signed by District Judge Thad Heartfield on 11/20/18. (tkd, ) |
|
Friday, November 09, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss
Fri 11/09 1:17 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Kroger Texas LP.(Greene, Adraon) (bjc, ) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 (11/9/2018) Revised Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 07/11 4:05 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Extend Scheduling and Docket Control Order Deadlines. Mediation deadline is 9/14/2018. Dispositive motions are due 9/21/2018. Joint final pretrial order is due 1/7/2019. The parties should be prepared to try the case on 1/22/2019. Signed by District Judge Thad Heartfield on 7/10/18. (tkd, ) |
|
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 06/22 12:32 PM
Agreed MOTION Extend Scheduling and Docket Control Order Deadlines by Kroger Texas LP.(Schick, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
notice
Notice of Docket Correction
Tue 03/27 9:04 AM
***FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore documents #9, 10 and 11, Responses to Discovery Requests. Discovery filings are not accepted by this Court. (tkd, ) |
||
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
respoth
Response to Non-Motion
Mon 03/26 6:52 PM
RESPONSE to Defendant's Request for Production filed by Najah Jahkur-Muhammad . (Broussard, Scott) |
|
10 | 10
respoth
Response to Non-Motion
Mon 03/26 6:51 PM
RESPONSE to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff filed by Najah Jahkur-Muhammad . (Broussard, Scott) |
|
9 | 9
respoth
Response to Non-Motion
Mon 03/26 6:49 PM
RESPONSE to Request for Admissions filed by Najah Jahkur-Muhammad . (Broussard, Scott) |
|
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Fri 03/16 4:22 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel David Schick on behalf of Kroger Texas LP (Schick, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
respoth
Amended Answer to Complaint
Thu 03/01 2:21 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint by Kroger Texas LP. (Greene, Adraon) |
|
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 02/21 3:51 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER setting various deadlines. Deadline to add parties 3/17/2018. Motions to amend pleadings due 4/13/2018. Dispositive motions deadline 6/22/2018. Mediation deadline 8/13/2018. Proposed joint final pretrial order due 12/10/2018. Parties should be prepared to try case on 12/17/2018. Signed by District Judge Thad Heartfield on 2/21/18. (tkd, ) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 02/15 11:33 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kroger Texas LP, filed by Najah Jahkur-Muhammad.(Broussard, Scott) |
|
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Thu 02/15 3:32 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Thad Heartfield: Management Conference held on 2/15/2018. Court will enter a scheduling order. (Court Reporter None.) (jmv, ) |
||
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Tue 01/30 9:20 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Cardenas, Juvie) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 01/26 8:56 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Kroger Texas LP (Cardenas, Juvie) Modified on 1/26/2018 (tkd, ) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 12/07 11:27 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Management Conference set for 2/15/2018 02:30 PM in Ctrm 1 (Beaumont) before District Judge Thad Heartfield. (jmv, ) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 11/22 12:14 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kroger Texas L.P. d/b/a Kroger Food Stores, KO34 Kroger East/Southwest from 136th District Court of Jefferson County, Texas, case number D-200823. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6563632), filed by Kroger Texas L.P. d/b/a Kroger Food Stores, KO34 Kroger East/Southwest.(Greene, Adraon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, Plaintiff's Orig Petition | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, Return on Service | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, Defendant's Orig Ans | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D-1, Copy of the state court Docket Sheet/Record | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D-2, Copy of Process | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D-3, List of Parties & Attys | ||
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet D-4 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 11/22 2:03 PM
Case Assigned to District Judge Thad Heartfield. (aam, ) |
||
misc
Jury Demand
Wed 11/22 2:07 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Najah Jahkur-Muhammad, Kroger Texas LP. (aam, ) |
||
misc
Docket Annotation
Wed 11/22 2:09 PM
The following attorney was contacted on 11/22/17 regarding admissions requirements to The Eastern District of Texas: Plaintiff's Atty Scott M. Broussard. (aam, ) |
||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Availability
Wed 11/22 2:10 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (aam, ) |