Capacity Funding LLC v. Mincey
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:17-bk-50399
Lead BK case is: 5:17-bk-50399
Connecticut Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Julie A Manning |
Case #: | 5:17-ap-05037 |
Nature of Suit | 67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny 68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury 62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud |
Case Filed: | Nov 27, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 27, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Roychelle Mincey
3903 Park Ave
Fairfield, CT 06825 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Capacity Funding LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/28/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Tuesday, November 27, 2018 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 11/27 2:02 PM
Adversary Proceeding 5:17-ap-5037 Closed . (Whitmore, Lorenzo) |
||
Saturday, November 03, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 11/04 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . Notice Date 11/03/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, October 31, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Stipulated Judgment
Thu 11/01 8:56 AM
Stipulated Judgment In Favor of Capacity Funding LLC Against Roychelle Mincey In the Amount of 68,500.00 By Judge Julie A. Manning 16 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiff Capacity Funding LLC.) (Whitmore, Lorenzo) |
|
17 | 17
order
Approve Settlement Agreement
Wed 10/31 3:06 PM
ORDER: Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement, ECF No. 16, is GRANTED. Approved Settlement Agreement to enter. . Signed by Chief Judge Julie A. Manning on October 31, 2018. (Rai, Sujata) |
|
Monday, October 29, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Approve Settlement Agreement
Mon 10/29 10:21 AM
Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement Filed by Robert M. Fleischer on behalf of Capacity Funding LLC, Plaintiff . Response(s) due by 11/19/2018. (Fleischer, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order and Stipulated Judgment | ||
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Notice
Fri 08/10 2:46 PM
Notice of Joint Status Report Filed by Robert M. Fleischer on behalf of Capacity Funding LLC Plaintiff, . (Fleischer, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
audio
Digital Audio Recording
Tue 07/24 7:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 7/24/2018 12:47:25 PM ]. File Size [ 1887 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:05:15 ]. (courtspeak) |
|
court
Hearing Held
Wed 07/25 9:50 AM
Hearing Held. For the reasons stated on the record, the Parties will file either a Rule 9019 Motion or a joint Status Report regarding a potential Settlement Agreement by August 10, 2018. 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Capacity Funding LLC). (Veliu, Qesar) |
||
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order
Mon 07/23 5:13 PM
ORDER: The Request for Continuance form, ECF No. 11, filed by counsel for the Defendant as a Motion, is not to be used in any circumstance other than for continuance of an initial hearing. In addition to the fact that the Request for Continuance form was untimely filed less than 20 hours prior to the Final Pre-trial conference scheduled to be held on July 24, 2018, at 12:00 p.m., the Pre-trial Conference is not an initial hearing, the form contains no information, is blank, and will not be considered by the Court. Failure of the Defendant to appear at the Final Pre-trial conference may result in the entry of a default and/or default judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Julie A. Manning on July 23, 2018. 11 Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing filed by Defendant Roychelle Mincey.) (Veliu, Qesar) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/23 4:56 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Jeffrey M. Sklarz on behalf of Capacity Funding LLC Plaintiff, . (Sklarz, Jeffrey) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Continue/Reschedule Hearing
Mon 07/23 4:27 PM
Motion to 8/14/2018 at 12:00 Hearing Request for Continuance of Initial Hearing Only Filed by Wendy Marie Weathers on behalf of Roychelle Mincey, Defendant Response(s) due by 08/13/2018. (Weathers, Wendy) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 02/27 4:21 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Wendy Marie Weathers on behalf of Roychelle Mincey Defendant, (Weathers, Wendy) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service | ||
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 02/02 4:05 PM
Amended Complaint by Robert M. Fleischer on behalf of Capacity Funding LLC against Roychelle Mincey. (Fleischer, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
audio
Digital Audio Recording
Tue 01/30 7:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/30/2018 1:19:39 PM ]. File Size [ 5899 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:16:23 ]. (courtspeak) |
|
court
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled
Tue 01/30 4:41 PM
Final Pre Trial Conference Continued per the statements made on the record; Amended Complaint to be filed by 2/2/2018; Answer due by 3/9/2018; Discovery to be completed by 6/15/2018; List of Witnesses/Exhibit(s) to be filed and exchanged by 7/11/2018. 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Capacity Funding LLC). ECF #7, Motion for Default withdrawn per the statements made on the record. Hearing to be held on 7/24/2018 at 12:00 PM at United States Bankruptcy Court, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Room 123, Courtroom, Bridgeport, CT. (Rai, Sujata) Modified on 1/31/2018 to add the motion for default withdrawn on the record in text. (Rai, Sujata) |
||
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Default
Mon 01/29 8:43 PM
Motion For Default against Roychelle Mincey for failure to plead in response to the complaint Filed by Robert M. Fleischer on behalf of Capacity Funding LLC, Plaintiff . (Fleischer, Robert) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Notice of Appearance
Thu 01/11 2:27 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Wendy Marie Weathers on behalf of Roychelle Mincey Defendant, . (Weathers, Wendy) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 12/01 2:55 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 11/30/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 11/28 5:46 PM
Summons Service Executed on Defendant(s) Roychelle Mincey 11/28/2017 by First Class Mail (Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7004(b)(1)) . (Fleischer, Robert) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Issued
Tue 11/28 9:23 AM
Summons Issued on Defendant(s) Roychelle Mincey Date Issued 11/28/2017, Answer Due 12/28/2017 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Capacity Funding LLC). Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/30/2018 at 12:00 PM at United States Bankruptcy Court, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Room 123, Courtroom, Bridgeport, CT. (Senteio, Renee) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Notice of Appearance
Mon 11/27 6:39 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Robert M. Fleischer on behalf of Capacity Funding LLC Plaintiff, . (Fleischer, Robert) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/27 5:48 PM
Adversary case 17-05037 Complaint (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) filed by Capacity Funding LLC against Roychelle Mincey. Fee Amount $350. Fee to be Paid by Internet Credit Card. (Fleischer, Robert) |