Tarsin Mobile Inc
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Neil W Bason |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-24643 |
Case Filed: | Nov 29, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Jan 16, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 22, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Tarsin Mobile Inc
32123 Lindero Canyon Rd Ste 210
Westlake Village, CA 91361-5461 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 39 minutes ago |
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
45 | 45
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 02/22 11:53 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing the above referenced case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the case is closed. (Sumlin, Sharon E.) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Thu 01/18 10:01 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/18/2018. (Admin.) |
|
43 | 43
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Thu 01/18 10:01 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 01/18/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Notice of dismissal w/restriction for refiling (BNC)
Tue 01/16 4:19 PM
Notice of dismissal with restriction for against debtor's refiling (BNC) (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina) |
|
41 | 41
order
Dismissal with special restriction-period against re-filing a new bankruptcy case (BNC-PDF)
Tue 01/16 4:18 PM
ORDER of dismissal with special restriction-period against re-filing a new bankruptcy case - Debtor Dismissed for 180 Days. (BNC-PDF)Barred Debtor Tarsin Mobile Inc starting 1/16/2018 to 7/15/2018 Signed on 1/16/2018 . (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina) |
|
40 | 40
misc
Monthly Operating Report
Tue 01/16 11:30 AM
Monthly Operating Report - Operating Report Number: 2 - For the Month Ending December 31, 2017; filed by Debtor Tarsin Mobile Inc . (Milano, Sonny) |
|
39 | 39
misc
Notice of Lodgment
Tue 01/16 9:50 AM
Notice of lodgment of Order Dismissing Case on the Court's Status Conference; Proof of Service Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (LA) . (Law, Dare) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Fri 01/12 9:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 01/12/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
court
Hearing Held (Other)
Thu 01/11 3:17 PM
Hearing Held on 01/09/18 at 1:00 p.m.: Dismiss with a bar per 109(g)(1) with judgment for UST (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Wed 01/10 9:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/10/2018. (Admin.) |
|
35 | 35
misc
Notice of UST's motion to dism or conv (11 to 7) (BNC)
Wed 01/10 11:30 AM
Notice of UST's motion to dismiss or convert case - chapter 11 to 7 (BNC) (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Statement
Mon 01/08 5:15 PM
Bank Statement Filed by Debtor Tarsin Mobile Inc . (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina) |
|
33 | 33
misc
Statement
Mon 01/08 5:13 PM
Bank Statement Filed by Debtor Tarsin Mobile Inc . (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina) |
|
32 | 32
misc
Monthly Operating Report
Mon 01/08 5:05 PM
Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 1 . For the Month Ending November 30, 2017 Filed by Debtor Tarsin Mobile Inc . (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina) |
|
31 | 31
court
Hearing Set(Motion)
Mon 01/08 12:58 PM
Hearing Set The Hearing date is set for 1/30/2018 at 01:00 PM at Crtrm 1545, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Neil W. Bason (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Notice of Deficiency of Filing Fees Required to Add Additional Creditors (BNC)
Mon 01/08 11:34 AM
Notice of Deficiency of Filing Fees Required to Add Additional Creditors (BNC) REMARK: Filing Fee also due for docket entry #16 .(Francis, Dawnette) |
|
29 | 29
motion
U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert (motion)
Mon 01/08 10:57 AM
U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert under 11 U.S.C. Section 1112(b) of the Bankruptcy Code; Declaration of Paralegal Specialist in Support Thererof; Proof of Service Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (LA). (Law, Dare) |
|
Saturday, December 30, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Sat 12/30 9:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/30/2017. (Admin.) |
|
27 | 27
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Sat 12/30 9:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 12/30/2017. (Admin.) |
|
26 | 26
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Sat 12/30 9:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 12/30/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Fri 12/29 9:43 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/29/2017. (Admin.) |
|
24 | 24
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Fri 12/29 9:43 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/29/2017. (Admin.) |
|
23 | 23
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Fri 12/29 9:43 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 12/29/2017. (Admin.) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Schedule A/B: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B)
Fri 12/29 3:29 PM
Schedule A/B Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) , Schedule C: The Property You Claimed as Exempt (Official Form 106C) , Schedule D Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D) , Schedule E/F Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F) , Schedule G Non-Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) , Schedule H Non-Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H) , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) Filed by Debtor Tarsin Mobile Inc . (Francis, Dawnette) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Monthly Operating Report
Fri 12/29 3:20 PM
Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 1 . For the Month Ending November 2017 Filed by Debtor Tarsin Mobile Inc . (Francis, Dawnette) |
|
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Thu 12/28 1:11 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/22/2018 at 09:00 AM at RM 7, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 3/23/2018.9 (Ventura, Olivia) |
|
18 | 18
order
Vacating Order (BNC-PDF)
Thu 12/28 12:17 PM
Order Vacating previous Order dismissing case with bar (BNC-PDF) Signed on 12/28/2017 . (Sumlin, Sharon E.) |
|
17 | 17
order
Vacating dismissal with 180-day restriction (Order and Notice) (BNC)
Thu 12/28 12:07 PM
Notice and order vacating dismissal with 180-day restriction for Debtor (BNC) Signed on 12/28/2017. (Sumlin, Sharon E.) |
|
Wednesday, December 27, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Notice of Deficiency of Filing Fees Required to Add Additional Creditors (BNC)
Wed 12/27 5:47 PM
Notice of Deficiency of Filing Fees Required to Add Additional Creditors (BNC) (Francis, Dawnette) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Notice of dismissal w/restriction for refiling (BNC)
Wed 12/27 2:32 PM
Notice of dismissal with restriction for against debtor's refiling (BNC) (Sumlin, Sharon E.) |
|
13 | 13
order
Dismissal with special restriction-period against re-filing a new bankruptcy case (BNC-PDF)
Wed 12/27 2:32 PM
ORDER of dismissal with special restriction-period against re-filing a new bankruptcy case - Debtor Dismissed for 180 days. (BNC-PDF)Barred Debtor Tarsin Mobile Inc starting 12/27/2017 to 6/25/2018 Signed on 12/27/2017 . (Sumlin, Sharon E.) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
List of Creditors (Master Mailing List of Creditors)
Wed 12/27 5:43 PM
Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) , List of Creditors (Master Mailing List of Creditors) Filed by Debtor Tarsin Mobile Inc . (Francis, Dawnette) |
|
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Fri 12/22 9:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/22/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF)
Wed 12/20 8:48 AM
Order Setting Deadlines for Filing of Creditor Matrix and All Other Case Commencement Papers and Continuing Status Conference (BNC-PDF) Signed on 12/20/2017 (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Fri 12/15 9:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 12/15/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Wed 12/13 5:08 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/22/2018 at 09:00 AM at RM 7, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 3/23/2018. (Ventura, Olivia) |
|
Saturday, December 02, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Sat 12/02 9:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/02/2017. (Admin.) |
|
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Sat 12/02 9:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 12/02/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Fri 12/01 9:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/01/2017. (Admin.) |
|
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Fri 12/01 9:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/01/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
court
Hearing Set (Other)
Thu 11/30 12:39 PM
Hearing Set Status hearing to be held on 12/19/2017 at 01:00 PM at Crtrm 1545, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Neil W. Bason (Sumlin, Sharon E.) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Notice to creditors (BNC-PDF)
Thu 11/30 12:39 PM
Notice to creditors (BNC-PDF) Order setting (A) Principal status conference and (B) Procedures....12/19/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Sumlin, Sharon E.) |
|
2 | 2
order
X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF)
Thu 11/30 11:17 AM
Order setting (A) Principal status conference and (B) Procedrures....Set for hearing: 12/19/17 at 1:00 p.m. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 11/30/2017 (Sumlin, Sharon E.) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
9
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 11/29 2:44 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Tarsin Mobile Inc Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 12/13/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 12/13/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 12/13/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 12/13/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 12/13/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 12/13/2017. Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 12/13/2017. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 12/13/2017. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 12/13/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 12/13/2017. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 12/13/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 12/13/2017. (Fierro, Viridiana) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2017 (Fierro, Viridiana) |
|
court
X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired)
Wed 11/29 9:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1717.00 by 03. Receipt Number 20223638. (admin) |