Fred's Stores of Tennessee Inc v. Wildevco LLC et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Donald C Coggins, Jr |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03241 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Dec 01, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 13, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 30, 2018 6:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wildevco LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fred's Stores of Tennessee Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Judgment
Fri 04/13 2:40 PM
JUDGMENT / The court has ordered that the defendant's motion to dismiss is granted and this case is dismissed without prejudice. (abuc) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 04/13 2:37 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 18 consent motion to dismiss without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 4/13/2018.(abuc) |
|
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Dismiss
Mon 04/09 2:30 PM
Consent MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 4/23/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Williams, Blake) |
|
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
minutes
Telephone Conference
Thu 03/08 12:40 PM
MINUTE ENTRY: The Court held a telephone conference with counsel and discussed the procedural posture of the case. Based upon a related, pending matter in the Court of Appeals that may materially impact this case, the parties discussed the possibility of dismissing this matter with leave to refile. Counsel will discuss this with their clients and report back to the Court within 30 days. If the parties authorize this procedure, counsel will file an appropriate consent motion and proposed order. Proceedings held before Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr: Telephone Conference held on 3/8/2018. (abuc) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Hearing
Mon 01/22 1:59 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 3/8/2018 10:30 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340.(abuc) |
|
14 | 14
order
Pretrial Order
Mon 01/22 1:56 PM
ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Notice to follow. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 1/22/2018. (abuc) |
|
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 01/22 1:21 PM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 2/12/2018, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/9/2018, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/2/2018, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/1/2018, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/21/2018, Discovery due by 7/23/2018, Motion in Limine due by 9/19/2018, Motions due by 8/6/2018, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 9/28/2018, Jury Selection Deadline 10/19/2018, Mediation Due by 8/20/2018, (abuc) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Thu 01/11 4:16 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Wildevco LLC.(Ruparelia, Roopal) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 01/11 4:08 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Wildevco LLC.(Ruparelia, Roopal) |
|
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
discov
Rule 26(f) Report
Thu 01/04 2:58 PM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Fred's Stores of Tennessee Inc.(LaFave, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Wed 12/20 11:12 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Fred's Stores of Tennessee Inc.(LaFave, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Case Reassigned CV
Thu 12/14 9:36 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Donald C Coggins, Jr. Judge J Michelle Childs no longer assigned to the case. (suro, ) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice and Acknowledgment of Removal
Thu 12/07 9:42 AM
NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Barnwell County.(Williams, Blake) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Acknowledgement of Filing of the Notice of Removal | ||
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Mediation Order
Fri 12/01 2:12 PM
MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 5/23/2018, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 12/1/2017. (asni, ) |
|
5 | 5
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 12/01 2:09 PM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 12/21/2017, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 1/4/2018, Rule 26 Report due by 1/4/2018, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/14/2018, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/16/2018, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/16/2018, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/16/2018, Discovery due by 5/16/2018, Motion in Limine due by 7/6/2018, Motions due by 5/30/2018, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/6/2018, Pretrial Briefs due by 7/31/2018, Jury Selection Deadline 8/7/2018, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 12/1/2017. (asni, ) |
|
3 | 3
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Fri 12/01 12:59 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(asni, ) |
|
2 | 2
respoth
Answer to Complaint Notice of Removal
Fri 12/01 12:58 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(asni, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Policy, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Lease Agreement | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 12/01 12:56 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Barnwell County, case number 2017-CP 06-00421 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7489921), filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(asni, ) |
|
Att: 1 State Court Documents |