GRAND STAIRCASE ESCALANTE PARTNERS et al v. TRUMP et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Tanya S Chutkan |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02591 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Dec 04, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 30, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 02, 2018 6:06 AM EDT |
Defendant
DONALD J. TRUMP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RYAN ZINKE
|
Represented By
|
Movant
GARFIELD COUNTY, UTAH
|
Represented By
|
Movant
KANE COUNTY, UTAH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CONSERVATION LANDS FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GRAND STAIRCASE ESCALANTE PARTNERS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SOCIETY OF VERTEBRATE PALEONTOLOGY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, October 05, 2023 | ||
notice
Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status
Thu 10/05 9:31 AM
NOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re (55 in 1:17-cv-02591-TSC) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC.. Attorney Sharon Buccino terminated. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-02587-TSC, 1:17-cv-02591-TSC(Buccino, Sharon). Your attorney renewal/government certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 10/12/2023. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-02587-TSC, 1:17-cv-02591-TSC(zmrl) |
||
Wednesday, October 04, 2023 | ||
55 | 55
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Wed 10/04 4:09 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC.. Attorney Sharon Buccino terminated. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-02587-TSC, 1:17-cv-02591-TSC(Buccino, Sharon) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2023 | ||
54 | 54
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 09/28 4:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ivan L London on behalf of GARFIELD COUNTY, UTAH, KANE COUNTY, UTAH Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-02587-TSC, 1:17-cv-02591-TSC(London, Ivan) |