2015-3 IH2 Borrower LP et al v. Stewart
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy C Batten, Sr |
Referred: | Linda T Walker |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-04855 |
Nature of Suit | 230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 01, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 26, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 30, 2018 6:00 AM EDT |
Defendant
Chanvish Stewart
and all others occupants 8913 Dorsey Rd.
Riverdale, GA 30274 |
|
Plaintiff
2015-3 IH2 Borrower LP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Progress Residential 2016-1 Borrower, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Letter
Mon 03/26 5:02 PM
REMAND LETTER with certified copy of Order of Remand mailed to Clerk, Magistrate Court of Clayton County, GA. (jlm) (Case not in Odyssey EFile) |
|
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order on Final Report and Recommendation
Mon 03/26 4:49 PM
ORDER ADOPTING the Magistrate Judge's3 Final Report and Recommendation and REMANDING case to the Magistrate Court of Clayton County. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 3/26/18. (jlm) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Mon 03/26 5:14 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (jlm) |
||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Mon 03/26 5:15 PM
Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Chanvish Stewart re5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. (jlm) |
||
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Mon 03/19 11:40 AM
Submission of3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re2 Notice of Removal, filed by Chanvish Stewart, submitted to District Judge Timothy C. Batten. (jlm) |
||
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order for Service of Report and Recommendation
Wed 02/28 4:32 PM
ORDER for Service of3 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 2/27/18. (jlm) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Report and Recommendation - Final
Wed 02/28 4:30 PM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending remanding2 Notice of Removal, filed by Chanvish Stewart to the Magistrate Court of Clayton County and ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 2/27/18. (jlm) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 02/28 4:27 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL, filed by Chanvish Stewart.(jlm) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
order
Order ruling on IFP
Wed 02/28 4:31 PM
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Contained in Final R&R) Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 2/27/18. (jlm) |
||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Wed 02/28 4:36 PM
Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Chanvish Stewart re4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation,3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re2 Notice of Removal, filed by Chanvish Stewart. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. (jlm) |
||
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Mon 12/04 10:09 AM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (btql) |
||
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 12/04 10:08 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Chanvish Stewart.(btql) |
|
Att: 1 Petition for Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |