Allstate Insurance Company v. Crawford
Louisiana Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Shelly D Dick |
Referred: | Richard L Bourgeois, Jr |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01722 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | Dec 04, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 22, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 02, 2018 3:33 AM CDT |
Defendant
Mary Grantham Crawford
|
|
Plaintiff
Allstate Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, October 22, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
order
Judgment - Default
Mon 10/22 3:09 PM
ORDER: Judgment by default be entered in favor of Plaintiff, Allstate Insurance Company and against Defendant, Mary Grantham Crawford in the sum of One Hundred Thousand, Two Hundred Fifty and no cents ($100,250.00) plus costs. This Judgment is a final judgment with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/22/2018. (KAH) |
|
19 | 19
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Mon 10/22 3:00 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Default Judgment. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/22/2018. (KAH) |
|
Thursday, April 12, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Default Judgment
Thu 04/12 2:21 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Mary Grantham Crawford by Allstate Insurance Company.(Donovan, James) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 9 Proposed Pleading; | ||
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice to Counsel
Fri 03/23 11:56 AM
Notice to Counsel: In view of the Default by Clerk (R. Doc. 16) entered on 3/23/2018, the Scheduling Conference set for 3/29/2018 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. is CANCELLED. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) |
|
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Entry of Default
Fri 03/23 10:47 AM
Entry of Default by Clerk entered on 03/23/2018. (ELW) |
|
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Clerks Entry of Default
Fri 03/23 10:22 AM
MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Mary Grantham Crawford by Allstate Insurance Company.(ELW) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Attachment | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Tue 03/20 2:27 PM
ORDER granting13 MOTION for Leave to File Request to Enter Default filed by Allstate Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 3/20/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BKA) |
|
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Leave to File Document
Wed 03/07 9:28 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Request to Enter Default by Allstate Insurance Company.(Donovan, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading; Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Pleading; Request for default, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Pleading; Default by Clerk | ||
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice to Counsel
Wed 02/21 3:33 PM
Notice to Counsel: Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2018 is RESET for 3/29/2018 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Any amendments to the Status Report are due by 3/15/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of (other)
Thu 02/01 3:59 PM
Status Report (separate) by Allstate Insurance Company (ELW) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 01/31 2:36 PM
ORDER: Scheduling Conference reset for 2/22/2018 at 02:15 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Any amendments to the Status Report are due by 2/8/2018. The Clerk of Court shall send notice of this conference to defendant Mary Grantham Crawford at 203020 Sidney Lane, Denham Springs, Louisiana, 70726. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/31/2018. (KAH) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Wed 01/31 10:09 AM
ORDER granting (R. Doc. 8) MOTION for Leave to File Separate Status Report filed by Allstate Insurance Company. Status Report by Allstate Insurance Company (R. Doc. 8-1) shall filed into the record of this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/31/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
utility
Motion(s) Referred
Fri 01/26 9:58 AM
MOTION(S) REFERRED:8 MOTION for Leave to File Separate Status Report . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW) |
||
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Leave to File Document
Thu 01/25 10:38 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Separate Status Report by Allstate Insurance Company.(Donovan, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading;, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment Proposed Order | ||
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Return of Service of Subpoena
Fri 01/12 4:21 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Mary Grantham Crawford served on 1 5-2018 by Process Server (Donovan, James) Modified to edit text on 1/12/2018 (SGO) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
90 Day Conference Order
Wed 12/13 4:07 PM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/8/2018 at 02:15 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 1/25/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/13/2017. (JSL) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 12/13 11:08 AM
Summons Issued as to Mary Grantham Crawford. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (EDC) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Not Previously Submitted
Wed 12/13 10:25 AM
Summons Submitted (Donovan, James) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 12/06 3:33 PM
Summons Issued as to Mary Grantham Crawford. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Not Previously Submitted
Wed 12/06 3:09 PM
Summons Submitted (Donovan, James) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 12/05 7:57 AM
Case reassigned to Judge Shelly D. Dick. Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH) |
||
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Complete Case Opening First)
Mon 12/04 4:23 PM
COMPLAINT against Allstate Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053N-1683430.), filed by Allstate Insurance Company.(Donovan, James) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment |