Lakota v. Howsmon et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-27428
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-27428
California Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Christopher M Klein |
Case #: | 2:17-ap-02229 |
Nature of Suit | 68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury 62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud |
Case Filed: | Dec 05, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 13, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Marvin Lynn Howsmon
3524 Paul Dr.
Anderson, CA 96007 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rebecca Ann Howsmon
3524 Paul Dr.
Anderson, CA 96007 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mathew M. Lakota
1900 Oro Dam Blvd E #12-300
Oroville, CA 95966 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, November 16, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
utility
BNC Service of Document (Certificate)
Fri 11/16 9:23 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, November 14, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
notice
BNC Service of Document
Wed 11/14 10:16 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (bres) |
|
42 | 42
order
Judgment
Wed 11/14 10:16 AM
Amended Judgment against Plaintiff Mathew M. Lakota (bres) |
|
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
utility
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 11/13 10:48 AM
Adversary Proceeding 2:17-ap-2229 Closed (bres) |
||
Saturday, October 27, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
utility
BNC Service of Document (Certificate)
Sat 10/27 9:17 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, October 25, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
notice
BNC Service of Document
Thu 10/25 11:36 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (bres) |
|
39 | 39
order
Judgment
Thu 10/25 11:35 AM
Judgment against Plaintiff Mathew M. Lakota (bres) |
|
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Matter Held *
Wed 10/17 9:00 AM
Civil Minutes -- Trial Judgment for defendant Re: Continued Trial Re: Complaint to Determine that Debt is Non-Dischargeable -1 -1 - (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) : Complaint by Mathew M. Lakota against Marvin Lynn Howsmon, Rebecca Ann Howsmon. (Fee $350.00) (dpas) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2017 (kvas). (admin) |
|
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Matter Continued *
Wed 10/03 1:34 PM
Civil Minutes -- Trial continued Re:1 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) : Complaint by Mathew M. Lakota against Marvin Lynn Howsmon, Rebecca Ann Howsmon. (Fee $350.00) (dpas) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2017 (kvas).; Trial set for 10/16/2018 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (jtis) |
|
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
utility
BNC Service of Order (Certificate)
Wed 08/22 9:24 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) |
|
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
order
Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing
Mon 08/20 8:57 AM
Order to Continue Trial Re:1 Complaint ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Trial set for 10/3/2018 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 33, Department C (kvas) |
|
35 | 35
order
Generic Order
Mon 08/20 9:01 AM
Order Denying34 Motion/Application to Recuse (kvas) |
|
35 | 35
order
Appear (Sua Sponte)
Mon 08/20 9:04 AM
Order to Appear Re:1 Complaint (kvas) |
|
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Generic Motion/Application - Including Amended Motion
Tue 08/14 2:05 PM
Motion/Application to Recuse Filed by Plaintiff Mathew M. Lakota (kvas) |
|
33 | 33
misc
Matter Continued *
Tue 08/14 1:49 PM
Civil Minutes -- Trial continued Re:1 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) : Complaint by Mathew M. Lakota against Marvin Lynn Howsmon, Rebecca Ann Howsmon. (Fee $350.00) (dpas) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2017 (kvas).; Trial set for 10/3/2018 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 33, Department C (jtis) |
|
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Matter Continued *
Wed 08/08 1:24 PM
Civil Minutes -- Trial continued Re:1 Complaint; Trial set for 8/14/2018 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 33, Department E (jtis) |
|
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
related
Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments
Wed 07/25 3:25 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service (kvas) |
|
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
related
Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments
Thu 07/19 3:43 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of28 Declaration,29 Declaration (kvas) |
|
29 | 29
related
Declaration
Thu 07/19 3:42 PM
Declaration of Mathew M. Lakota Re:1 Complaint (kvas) |
|
28 | 28
related
Declaration
Thu 07/19 3:39 PM
Declaration of David Parmer Re:1 Complaint (kvas) |
|
Sunday, July 15, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
utility
BNC Service of Order (Certificate)
Sun 07/15 9:28 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
order
Set/Continue/Reschedule Hearing
Fri 07/13 8:25 AM
Order to Set Trial Re:1 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) : Complaint by Mathew M. Lakota against Marvin Lynn Howsmon, Rebecca Ann Howsmon. (Fee $350.00) (dpas) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2017 (kvas). ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Trial set for 8/8/2018 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (kvas) |
|
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Matter Continued *
Fri 06/29 1:28 PM
Civil Minutes -- Trial set Re:1 Complaint; Trial set for 8/8/2018 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (jtis) |
|
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Court's Certificate of Mailing (via USPS) (Produces Form)
Wed 05/30 9:25 AM
Court's Certificate of Mailing of23 Civil Minutes -- Hearing Continued (jtis) |
|
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Matter Continued *
Wed 05/30 9:23 AM
Civil Minutes -- Pre-Trial Conference continued Re:1 Complaint; Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/26/2018 at 02:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (jtis) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Matter Continued *
Wed 05/30 9:04 AM
ENTERED ON DOCKET IN ERROR - NO IMAGE AVAILABLE Civil Minutes -- Pre-Trial Conference continued Re:1 Complaint; Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/26/2018 at 02:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (jtis) Modified on 5/30/2018 (jtis) |
|
Tuesday, May 15, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
related
Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments
Tue 05/15 4:03 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service (kvas) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Pretrial Conference Statement
Tue 05/15 3:58 PM
Pretrial Conference Statement Filed by Plaintiff Mathew M. Lakota (kvas) |
|
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
related
Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments
Wed 05/09 8:12 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of18 Pretrial Conference Statement (kvas) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Pretrial Conference Statement
Wed 05/09 7:19 AM
Pretrial Conference Statement Filed by Defendants Marvin Lynn Howsmon, Rebecca Ann Howsmon (kvas) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
utility
BNC Service of Order (Certificate)
Wed 02/14 9:26 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Matter Held *
Wed 02/14 10:25 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status conference Dropped from calendar Re: Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 -1 - (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) : Complaint by Mathew M. Lakota against Marvin Lynn Howsmon, Rebecca Ann Howsmon. (Fee $350.00) (dpas) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2017 (kvas). (admin) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order
Mon 02/12 2:57 PM
Scheduling Order Re:1 Complaint - Pre-Trial Hearing ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 5/29/2018 at 02:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C; Discovery due by 4/16/2018. (kvas) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
related
Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments
Tue 02/06 4:16 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of13 Status Conference Statement (kvas) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Status Conference Statement
Tue 02/06 4:15 PM
Status Conference Statement Re:1 Complaint Filed by Defendants Marvin Lynn Howsmon, Rebecca Ann Howsmon (kvas) |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
related
Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments
Wed 01/24 12:00 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of11 Initial Disclosures (svim) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Initial Disclosures
Wed 01/24 11:59 AM
Initial Disclosures Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Mathew M. Lakota (svim) |
|
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
related
Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments
Wed 01/03 12:06 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of9 Answer to Complaint [JSO-1] (kvas) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 01/03 12:05 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Marvin Lynn Howsmon, Rebecca Ann Howsmon. (kvas) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint
Wed 12/06 12:32 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (kvas) |
|
7 | 7
cmp
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint
Wed 12/06 12:31 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (kvas) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
related
Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments
Tue 12/05 12:49 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of1 Complaint (dpas) |
|
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order to Confer
Tue 12/05 12:39 PM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (dpas) |
|
4 | 4
misc
BDRP
Tue 12/05 12:39 PM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (dpas) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Issued
Tue 12/05 12:38 PM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 2/13/2018 at 02:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (dpas) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Adversary Cover Sheet
Tue 12/05 12:38 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Intake)
Tue 12/05 12:37 PM
(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) : Complaint by Mathew M. Lakota against Marvin Lynn Howsmon, Rebecca Ann Howsmon. (Fee $350.00) (dpas) |
|
misc
CR/ECF - Adversary Fee Paid
Tue 12/05 4:10 PM
Adversary Proceeding Fee Paid ($350.00, Receipt Number: 28908 by 41) (auto) |