USA v. Rhineheimer et al
Kentucky Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Danny C Reeves |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00477 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1345 Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Dec 05, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 14, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Jun 03, 2018 5:03 AM EDT |
Defendant
Kentucky Housing Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gregory Dale Rhineheimer, Jr.
|
|
Defendant
Heather Nicole Rhineheimer
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unknown Spouse of Gregory Dale Rhineheimer, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 29, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Other Notice
Wed 10/30 2:24 PM
U.S. MARSHAL'S RETURN re33 Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds. (MDC) |
|
Friday, September 20, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds
Fri 09/20 3:34 PM
ORDER: 1. Plaintiff's32 Motion for Disbursement of Funds is GRANTED; 2. USM is ORDERED to disburse the sum of $110,000.00 to the USA; 3. This matter is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 9/20/2019. (SLH) |
|
32 | 32
motion
Disbursement of Funds
Fri 09/20 2:25 PM
MOTION for Disbursement of Funds by USA(Mason, A.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 27, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Confirm U.S Marshal's Report of Sale
Tue 08/27 8:57 AM
ORDER: 1. granting30 Motion to Confirm U.S. Marshal's Report of Sale. 2. The Report of Sale filed by the United States Department of Agriculture, Rural Development, formerly Farmer's Home Administration, on August 12, 2019 [Record No.29 ], is RATIFIED and CONFIRMED. 3. The United States Marshal for the Eastern District of Kentucky or, in his absence, the Chief Deputy Marshal, is directed to execute a deed for the subject property to Vekmar Properties, LLC, to present the deed to the Clerk of this Court for proper acknowledgment, and to deliver the deed to the purchaser in exchange for payment in full of the purchase price. 4. The Clerk is directed to provide a copy of this Order to Counsel for the United States; the United States Marshals Office in Lexington, Kentucky; and Purchaser Vekmar Properties, LLC, P.O. Box 1400, Nicholasville, Kentucky 40356. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 8/27/19. (JLM) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Confirm Report of Sale
Mon 08/26 11:21 AM
MOTION to Confirm Report of Sale by USA(Mason, A.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 12, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Report of Sale
Mon 08/12 3:50 PM
Report of Sale. (Mason, A.) |
|
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 08/30 10:52 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Heather Nicole Rhineheimer re27 Judgment and Order of Sale (JJ) |
|
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
order
Judgment Terminate Motions
Tue 08/14 9:06 AM
JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF SALE: 1. JOINT MOTION for Order of Sale is GRANTED. 2. USA is hereby granted Judgment as follows: a) against Heather Nicole Rhineheimer for total unpaid balance of $175,361.46. b) against Gregory Dale Rhineheimer, Jr. for a total unpaid balance of 175,361.46. c) against Kentucky Housing Corporation is found to have an interest in said property. said interest shall be second priority. 3. Federal liens attached. 4.Lien shall be foreclosed and property sold at auction. 5. Liens released to the extent listed within Judgment. 6. USA authorized to offer property for sale at public auction. 7. Sale subject to confirmation by this Court. 8. Proceeds shall be subjected first to payment of costs, then toward satisfaction of Judgment. 9. USA shall have possession of Property. 10. Action is continued for confirmation of sale, distribution of proceeds, and further orders/Judgments as necessary. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 8/14/2018.(JJ) |
|
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Judgment Order of Sale
Mon 08/13 6:05 PM
JOINT MOTION for Judgment by USA , JOINT MOTION for Order of Sale by USA(Mason, A.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
25 | 25
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Mon 08/13 9:57 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Gregory Dale Rhineheimer, Jr, Heather Nicole Rhineheimer, Unknown Spouse of Gregory Dale Rhineheimer, Jr.22 MOTION for Entry of Default by USA cc: COR (JJ) |
|
utility
Motion Submitted
Mon 08/13 8:39 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: re22 MOTION for Entry of Default by USA (JJ) |
||
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Fri 08/10 4:54 PM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mason, A.) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 08/10 4:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy M. Rettig on behalf of Kentucky Housing Corporation |
|
22 | 22
motion
Entry of Default
Fri 08/10 3:58 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default by USA(Mason, A.) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order For Meeting and Report
Fri 07/06 9:50 AM
ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. NLT 30 days parties shall conduct meeting to discuss prompt settlement or resolution of the case and develop a proposed discovery plan 2. At meeting parties shall exchange disclosures. 3. NLT 10 parties shall file joint written report outlining plan. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 7/6/2018.(JJ) |
|
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order Terminate Motions Add and Terminate Attorneys
Mon 04/16 9:20 AM
ORDER: 1)19 WOA Report is ACCEPTED and atty Inman's motion for an award of fees and reimbursement of expenses is GRANTED. 2) Atty Inman is relieved of any further duties as WOA in this action. It is further ORDERED that he be allowed an atty fee of $200 and reimbursement of expenses in the amt of $26.28. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/16/2018.(SCD) |
|
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Report for Warning Order Attorney Fees
Fri 04/13 6:09 PM
MOTION for Report for Warning Order Unable to notify Heather Nicole Rhineheimer , MOTION for Attorney Fees by Heather Nicole Rhineheimer(Inman, James) |
|
Att: 1 Report of WOA, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of WOA, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 - Correspondence, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 - Postage, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 - Returned Mailings, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 12, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for warning order attorney Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Thu 04/12 11:15 AM
ORDER: 1)16 Warning Order Report is ACCEPTED and the17 motion for an award of fees is GRANTED. 2) Atty Thompson is relieved of any further duties as WOA. It is further ORDERED that she be allowed an atty fee of $200 and costs in the amt of $25.96. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/12/2018. (SCD) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Attorney Fees
Thu 04/12 9:31 AM
FIRST MOTION for Attorney Fees by Unknown Spouse of Gregory Dale Rhineheimer, Jr.(Thompson, Doreen) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
16 | 16
motion
Report for Warning Order
Thu 04/12 9:30 AM
FIRST MOTION for Report for Warning Order Unable to notify Unknown Spouse of Gregory Dale Rhineheimer, Jr.(Thompson, Doreen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 02/27 4:28 PM
NOTICE: Following appointment and completion of services, WOA is requested to notify the Court if payment is not made w/in 60 days of the Order awarding fees. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 2/27/2018.(SCD) |
|
14 | 14
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for warning order attorney
Tue 02/27 4:26 PM
ORDER: (1)13 Motion for warning order attorney is GRANTED. (2) James Michael Inman is appointed WOA for Dft Heather Nicole Rhineheimer. (3) WOA shall inform dft and report results w/in 60 days. (4) If WOA cannot inform dft, so report and make a defense. If no defense, so report. (5) Pla's cause of action is for the foreclosure of pla's mortgage lien. (6) At the time of filing the report, WOA may also file a motion and affidavit for payment. (7) USA and WOA are referred to the Notice filed this date re the timing of payment of services provided by the WOA. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 2/27/2018. (SCD) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Warning order attorney
Tue 02/27 2:39 PM
MOTION for warning order attorney by USA(Mason, A.) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of A. George Mason, Jr., | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 02/22 9:10 AM
NOTICE: Following appointment and completion of services to be performed, the WOA is requested to notify the Court if payment is not made for services rendered w/in 60 days of the Order awarding fees and expenses. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 2/22/2018.(SCD) |
|
11 | 11
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for warning order attorney
Thu 02/22 9:09 AM
ORDER: (1)10 Motion for warning order attorney is GRANTED. (2) Doreen Helen-Marie Thompson is appointed WOA for defendant Unknown Spouse of Gregory Dale Rhineheimer, Jr. (3) WOA to inform dft and report results w/in 60 days. (4) If WOA cannot inform dft so report and make a defense. If no defense, so report. (5) Pla's cause of action is for the foreclosure of pla's mortgage lien. (6) At the time of the filing of the report, WOA may also file a motion and affidavit for payment. (7) USA and WOA are referred to the Notice filed this date re the timing of payment of services provided by the WOA. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 2/22/2018. (SCD) |
|
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Warning order attorney
Wed 02/21 2:10 PM
MOTION for warning order attorney by USA(Mason, A.) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of A. George Mason, Jr., | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, February 19, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Mon 02/19 2:11 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by USA as to Heather Nicole Rhineheimer. (Mason, A.) |
|
Monday, January 15, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Mon 01/15 3:45 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by USA as to Kentucky Housing Corporation. (Mason, A.) |
|
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 01/04 7:51 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified Mail to Gregory Dale Rhineheimer, Jr served on 12/8/2017, answer due 12/29/2017. (Mason, A.) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1
Tue 12/12 8:09 AM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kentucky Housing Corporation. (Solomon, Stephen) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Deficiency re: Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Mon 12/11 4:08 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Stephen Soloman. An4 Answer to Complaint has been filed by Kentucky Housing Corporation without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (AWD) |
|
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 12/11 11:06 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Kentucky Housing Corporation.(Solomon, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 12/05 4:40 PM
Summons Issued as to Kentucky Housing Corporation, Gregory Dale Rhineheimer, Jr, Heather Nicole Rhineheimer; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically for service by certified mail.(VA) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Heather Rhineheimer, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Kentucky Housing Corporation | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 12/05 4:34 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-3952776), filed by USA(VA) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Promissory Note, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Mortgage for Kentucky, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Subsidy Repayment Agreement, | ||
Att: 5 Affidavit of Kimberly Williamson, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit KHC Mortgage, | ||
Att: 7 Summons Gregory Rhineheimer, | ||
Att: 8 Summons Heather Rhineheimer, | ||
Att: 9 Summons Kentucky Housing Corporation | ||
misc
Conflict Check
Tue 12/05 4:35 PM
Conflict Check run. (VA) |