Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Gene Ek Pratter
Case #: 2:17-cv-05429
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause28:1345 Foreclosure
Case Filed:Dec 04, 2017
Terminated:Mar 05, 2018
Last checked: Saturday Jun 02, 2018 6:07 AM EDT
Defendant
FRAZER SHOPPING CENTER INVESTORS, L.P.
Represented By
SCOTT PHILIP SHECTMAN
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
RONA J. ROSEN
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg & Ellers, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Represented By
RAYMOND A. QUAGLIA
Ballard Spahr Andrews & Ingersoll, LLP
contact info
Receiver
METRO COMMERCIAL


Docket last updated: 05/21/2019 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, January 17, 2019
22 22 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Party Fri 8:38 AM
ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S AND NON-PARTY 480-490 LANCASTER AVENUE LLC'S MOTION TO SUBSTITUE PARTY (DOC.15 ) IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF THE COURT SHALL:1. SUBSTITUTE 480-490 LANCASTER AVENUE LLC FOR WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.; AND2. ENTER THE APPEARANCE OF BROWN MCGARRY NIMEROFF LLC FOR THE NEW PLAINTIFF, 480-490 LANCASTER AVENUE LLC AND TERMINATE THE APPEARANCES OF RAYMOND A. QUAGLIA AND CLIFFORD SACALIS OF BALLARD SPAHR, LLP FOR PLAINTIFF. ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 1/16/2019.1/18/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 07, 2018
21 21 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 9:47 AM
ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT FRAZER SHOPPING CENTER INVESTORS, L.P. SHALL RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THE JOINT MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTIES BY 12/20/2018. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 12/6/2018. 12/10/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 02, 2018
20 20 motion Brief and Statement Fri 4:05 PM
Supplemental Plaintiff's Brief and Statement of Issues in Support of Request for Review of Joint Motion to Substitute Parties (ECF No. 15) filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A..Brief, Certificate of Service.(SACALIS, S.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit G (cont.)
Thursday, October 11, 2018
19 19 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 10:38 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE MATTER REGARDING THE MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE (DOC. NO. 15) HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR THURSDAY, OCTOBER 25, 2018 AT 4:00 P.M. WITH THE HON. GENE E.K. PRATTER. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IS INSTRUCTED TO GET ALL COUNSEL ON THE TELEPHONE AND THEN CALL IN TO CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7350 TO BE CONNECTED WITH THE JUDGE. (sme, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 09, 2018
18 18 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 3:27 PM
REPLY Brief in Support re15 Joint MOTION to Substitute Party filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. Certificate of Service. (SACALIS, S.) Modified on 10/9/2018 (lisad, )
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Tue 3:25 PM
Amended Notice of Assignment of Judgment (ECF No. 12) by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. Certificate of Service. (SACALIS, S.) Modified on 10/9/2018 (lisad, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 05, 2018
16 16 respm Response to Motion Fri 5:49 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re15 Joint MOTION to Substitute Party filed by FRAZER SHOPPING CENTER INVESTORS, L.P..(ROSEN, RONA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Monday, September 24, 2018
15 15 motion Substitute Party Mon 4:56 PM
Joint MOTION to Substitute Party filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A..Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(SACALIS, S.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Thursday, September 13, 2018
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Thu 9:06 PM
NOTICE by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. of Assignment of Judgment(SACALIS, S.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 9:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by S. CLIFFORD SACALIS on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. with Certificate of Service(SACALIS, S.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 06, 2018
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Fri 11:10 AM
NOTICE by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. of Assignment of Judgment(QUAGLIA, RAYMOND)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 1 pgs Certificate of Service
Monday, March 12, 2018
11 11 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Tue 10:18 AM
ORDER THAT THE PORTION OF THE 3/2/2018 ORDER DENYING THE MOTION TO APPOINT A RECEIVER IS VACATED. THE MOTION TO APPOINT A RECEIVER IS GRANTED AS UNOPPOSED. ALL OTHER PORTIONS OF THE 3/2/2018 ORDER REMAIN IN EFFECT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 3/12/2018. 3/13/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 05, 2018
10 10 3 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 10:32 AM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO APPOINT A RECEIVER (DOC.4 ) IS DENIED AS MOOT, AND THE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DOC.9 ) IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS CASE CLOSED FOR ALL PURPOSES, INCLUDING STATISTICS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 3/2/2018. 3/6/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2018
9 9 motion Entry of Default Thu 11:29 AM
Proposed MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A..Certificate of Service.(QUAGLIA, RAYMOND)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Whitney Wheeler,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 31, 2018
8 8 misc Request for Default Wed 3:11 PM
Request for Default Entry by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. against FRAZER SHOPPING CENTER INVESTORS, L.P..(QUAGLIA, RAYMOND)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
order Clerks Entry of Default Fri 9:51 AM
DEFAULT BY FRAZER SHOPPING CENTER INVESTORS, L.P. PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (jaa, )
Related: [-]
misc Default Entered Fri 9:51 AM
Default Entered (jaa, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2018
7 7 2 pgs order Order Setting Answer Deadline Tue 1:27 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER: THAT DEFENDANT'S TIME TO ANSWER THE COMPLAINT AND TO ANSWER THE MOTION SHALL BE EXTENDED UNTIL JANUARY 26, 2018. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 1/8/2018. 1/9/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (sme, )
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 8:42 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines per Doc.7 as to4 Proposed MOTION to Appoint Receiver . RESPONSES DUE BY 1/26/2018. (lisad, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2018
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT PHILIP SHECTMAN on behalf of FRAZER SHOPPING CENTER INVESTORS, L.P. with Certificate of Service(SHECTMAN, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, January 03, 2018
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 5:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by RONA J. ROSEN on behalf of FRAZER SHOPPING CENTER INVESTORS, L.P. with Certificate of Service(ROSEN, RONA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, December 22, 2017
4 4 motion Appoint Receiver Fri 11:02 AM
Proposed MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A..Memorandum, Affidavit.(QUAGLIA, RAYMOND)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit A to Order,
Att: 4 Affidavit Whitney Wheeler,
Att: 5 Exhibit A to Affidavit,
Att: 6 Exhibit B to Affidavit,
Att: 7 Exhibit C to Affidavit,
Att: 8 Exhibit D to Affidavit
Wednesday, December 20, 2017
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 10:55 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. re: Valentina Mawyin served Summons and Complaint upon FRAZER SHOPPING CENTER INVESTORS, L.P. by Personal Service. FRAZER SHOPPING CENTER INVESTORS, L.P. served on 12/19/2017, answer due 1/9/2018. (QUAGLIA, RAYMOND)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2017
2 2 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 (COURT ONLY) Tue 3:10 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent WELLS FARGO & COMPANY for WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A..(jaa, )
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 3:05 PM
COMPLAINT against FRAZER SHOPPING CENTER INVESTORS, L.P. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE169857.) filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A..(jaa, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form,
Att: 3 Case Management Track Form,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit
service Summons Issued Tue 3:07 PM
1 Summons Issued as to FRAZER SHOPPING CENTER INVESTORS, L.P.. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 12/5/17 (jaa, )
Related: [-]