UTAH DINE BIKEYAH et al v. TRUMP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-cv-02590
Lead case: 1:17-cv-02590
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Tanya S Chutkan |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02605 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 33:1365 Environmental Matters |
Case Filed: | Dec 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 30, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 04, 2018 5:41 AM EDT |
Defendant
TONY TOOKE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DONALD J. TRUMP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RYAN ZINKE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BRIAN STEED
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SONNY PERDUE
|
Represented By
|
Movant
GAIL JOHNSON
|
Represented By
|
Movant
SAN JUAN COUNTY, UTAH
|
Represented By
|
Movant
UTAH WILD SHEEP FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
Movant
UTAH BOWMEN'S ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Movant
BRANDON SULSER
|
Represented By
|
Movant
SPORTSMEN FOR FISH & WILDLIFE
|
Represented By
|
Movant
MICHAEL NOEL
|
Represented By
|
Movant
SANDY JOHNSON
|
Represented By
|
Movant
BIGGAME FOREVER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ARCHAEOLOGY SOUTHWEST
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SOCIETY OF VERTEBRATE PALEONTOLOGY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ACCESS FUND
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
UTAH DINE BIKEYAH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PATAGONIA WORKS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NATIONAL TRUST FOR HISTORIC PRESERVATION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FRIENDS OF CEDAR MESA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CONSERVATION LANDS FOUNDATION, INC.
|
Represented By
|
1. | Patagonia Joins Lawsuit to Block Trump's Federal Land Cuts (huffingtonpost.com) |
Submitted Thu 12/07/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, January 03, 2024 | ||
66 | 66
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 01/03 11:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen K. Kaiser on behalf of STATE OF UTAH Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-02590-TSC, 1:17-cv-02605-TSC, 1:17-cv-02606-TSC(Kaiser, Stephen) |