Bodyguard Productions, Inc. v. John Doe 1 et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Wiley Y Daniel |
Referred: | Michael E Hegarty |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02935 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Dec 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 12, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 04, 2018 2:51 AM MDT |
Plaintiff
Bodyguard Productions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
John Doe 2
Terminated: 04/12/2018
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 9
Terminated: 03/07/2018
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 8
Terminated: 01/24/2018
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 7
Terminated: 04/12/2018
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 6
Terminated: 04/12/2018
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 5
Terminated: 04/12/2018
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 4
Terminated: 04/12/2018
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 3
Terminated: 04/12/2018
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 25
Terminated: 04/12/2018
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 24
Terminated: 02/01/2018
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 23
Terminated: 04/12/2018
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 22
Terminated: 01/25/2018
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 21
Terminated: 04/12/2018
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 20
Terminated: 04/12/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe 19
Terminated: 03/13/2018
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 18
Terminated: 04/12/2018
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 17
Terminated: 04/12/2018
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 16
Terminated: 03/23/2018
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 15
Terminated: 04/12/2018
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 14
Terminated: 04/12/2018
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 13
Terminated: 04/12/2018
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 12
Terminated: 02/12/2018
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 11
Terminated: 04/12/2018
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 10
Terminated: 04/12/2018
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 1
Terminated: 01/24/2018
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, April 12, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Report re: Copyright
Thu 04/12 2:43 PM
Report re Copyright: Report on the determination of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (evana, ) |
|
38 | 38
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Thu 04/12 2:42 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE, In accordance with Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal ECF No.36 , filed on April 6, 2018, and in accordance with Plaintiff's Voluntary Dismissal of Case Without Prejudice ECF No.37 , filed on April 9, 2018, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), it is ORDERED that Defendant John Doe 20 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and shall hereafter be taken off the caption. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against all John Doe defendants are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/12/2018. (evana, ) |
|
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case
Mon 04/09 2:25 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case without prejudice by Plaintiff Bodyguard Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party
Fri 04/06 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 20 with Prejudice by Plaintiff Bodyguard Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott) |
|
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Fri 03/23 2:59 PM
ORDER re:34 Notice of Dismissal of Party filed by Bodyguard Productions, Inc., Defendant John Doe 16 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/23/2018. (evana, ) |
|
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party
Thu 03/22 2:48 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 16 with Prejudice by Plaintiff Bodyguard Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Tue 03/13 10:43 AM
ORDER re:32 Notice of Dismissal of Party filed by Bodyguard Productions, Inc., it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant John Doe 19 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/13/2018. (evana, ) |
|
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party
Mon 03/12 5:21 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 19 with Prejudice by Plaintiff Bodyguard Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott) |
|
31 | 31
misc
Status Report
Mon 03/12 4:47 PM
Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Bodyguard Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott) |
|
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Wed 03/07 3:55 PM
ORDER re:29 Notice of Dismissal of Party filed by Bodyguard Productions, Inc., John Doe 9 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/7/2018. (evana, ) |
|
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party
Wed 03/07 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 9 with Prejudice by Plaintiff Bodyguard Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Thu 03/01 10:46 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting26 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 03/01/2018. Plaintiff shall serve the remaining Defendants on or before 4/9/2018. (mdave, ) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
order
Memorandum
Wed 02/28 5:10 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding26 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants filed by Bodyguard Productions, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/28/18. Text Only Entry (rkeec) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 02/28 5:00 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants by Plaintiff Bodyguard Productions, Inc..(Kannady, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Status Report
Mon 02/12 4:59 PM
Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Bodyguard Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott) |
|
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Mon 02/12 11:28 AM
ORDER re:23 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party filed by Bodyguard Productions, Inc.. it is ORDERED that Defendant John Doe 12 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/12/2018. (evana, ) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party
Fri 02/09 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 12 without Prejudice by Plaintiff Bodyguard Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott) |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Thu 02/01 10:38 AM
ORDER In accordance with Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal ECF No.21 , filed on January 31, 2018, it is ORDERED that Defendant John Doe 24 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/1/2018. (evana, ) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party
Wed 01/31 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 24 with Prejudice by Plaintiff Bodyguard Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Thu 01/25 11:30 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/25/2018. Defendant John Doe 22 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE , pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), and shall hereafter be taken off the caption. (sphil, ) |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party
Wed 01/24 5:10 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 22 without Prejudice by Plaintiff Bodyguard Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott) |
|
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Wed 01/24 11:16 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/24/2018. Defendant John Doe 1 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption. (sphil, ) |
|
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Wed 01/24 11:00 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/24/2018. Defendant John Doe 8 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption. (sphil, ) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party
Tue 01/23 5:22 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 1 without Prejudice by Plaintiff Bodyguard Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party
Tue 01/23 4:43 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 8 with Prejudice by Plaintiff Bodyguard Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Mon 01/22 9:14 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Erin Kathryn Russell on behalf of John Doe 20Attorney Erin Kathryn Russell added to party John Doe 20(pty:dft) (Russell, Erin) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Status Report
Wed 01/10 5:19 PM
Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Bodyguard Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Status Report
Mon 12/11 12:56 PM
Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Bodyguard Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Expedite
Thu 12/07 7:57 AM
ORDER granting2 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/7/2017. (mdave, ) |
|
10 | 10
order
Minute Order
Thu 12/07 7:10 AM
MINUTE ORDER This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty pursuant to an Order Referring Case entered by Senior Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a status report on the tenth day of each month informing the Court of the status of service in this case. For its monthly reports, Plaintiff need not file a separate report in each case, but may include this case in one monthly report of associated cases; however, Plaintiff shall separately notify the Court in which case the monthly status report is filed. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/07/2017. Text Only Entry (mehlc1, ) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Memorandum
Wed 12/06 5:00 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding2 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Bodyguard Productions, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/6/17. Text Only Entry (rkeec) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 12/06 4:59 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for dispositive matters. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause. (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. (4) Conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. (5) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. (6) Conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. By Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/6/17. Text Only Entry (rkeec) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Summons Issued
Wed 12/06 4:36 PM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (dbera, ) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form | ||
6 | 6
misc
Report re: Copyright
Wed 12/06 4:34 PM
Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (dbera, ) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Wed 12/06 4:32 PM
Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (dbera, ) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Case Association
Wed 12/06 1:44 PM
NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Scott Thomas Kannady on behalf of BODYGUARD PRODUCTIONS, INC. (Kannady, Scott) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 12/06 1:43 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Kannady, Scott) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Expedite
Wed 12/06 1:42 PM
MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Plaintiff BODYGUARD PRODUCTIONS, INC..(Kannady, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 12/06 1:39 PM
COMPLAINT against John Doe 1, John Doe 10, John Doe 11, John Doe 12, John Doe 13, John Doe 14, John Doe 15, John Doe 16, John Doe 17, John Doe 18, John Doe 19, John Doe 2, John Doe 20, John Doe 21, John Doe 22, John Doe 23, John Doe 24, John Doe 25, John Doe 3, John Doe 4, John Doe 5, John Doe 6, John Doe 7, John Doe 8, John Doe 9 (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-5838859)Attorney Scott Thomas Kannady added to party BODYGUARD PRODUCTIONS, INC.(pty:pla), filed by BODYGUARD PRODUCTIONS, INC..(Kannady, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |