STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 73.150.158.158
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Renee Marie Bumb |
Referred: | Karen M Williams |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-12780 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Dec 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 04, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 05, 2018 5:39 AM EDT |
Defendant
JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 73.150.158.158
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Wed 04/04 9:03 AM
***Civil Case Terminated with prejudice. (rtm, ) |
||
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 04/03 12:56 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC (ATKIN, JOHN) |
|
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 03/06 4:43 PM
First MOTION for an Extension of Time Within in Which to Effectuate Service of Process in this Matter by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC.(ATKIN, JOHN) |
|
Att: 1 Certification, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 03/07 9:44 AM
Set Deadlines as to7 First MOTION for an Extension of Time Within in Which to Effectuate Service of Process in this Matter . Motion set for 4/2/2018 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, ) |
||
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 02/15 9:47 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH ABRAHAM BAHGAT on behalf of JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 73.150.158.158 (BAHGAT, JOSEPH) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Discovery
Wed 01/17 4:19 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Discovery; ORDERED that Plaintiff may serve Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, John Doe Subscriber Assigned IP Address 73.150.158.158s ISP provider, with a Rule 45 subpoena commanding the ISP to provide Plaintiff with the true name and address only associated with the IPaddress set forth in the Complaint, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 1/17/2018. (rtm, ) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 12/19 9:01 AM
Set Deadlines as to4 First MOTION for Discovery Seeking Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference . Motion set for 1/16/2018 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, ) |
||
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Discovery
Mon 12/18 6:41 PM
First MOTION for Discovery Seeking Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC.(ATKIN, JOHN) |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A -- Declaration of Greg Lansky, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B -- Declaration of Tobias Fieser, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C -- Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, | ||
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 6 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
AO121 Copyright Form
Thu 12/07 3:53 PM
AO121 Copyright Form filed. (rss, ) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 12/07 12:19 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC identifying GENERAL MEDIA SYSTEMS, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (ATKIN, JOHN) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 12/07 12:18 PM
COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 73.150.158.158 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8311875) with JURY DEMAND, filed by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC.(ATKIN, JOHN) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 12/07 2:49 PM
Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (mmb, ) |
||
notice
Notice of Judicial Preferences
Thu 12/07 3:53 PM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (rss, ) |