Globis et al v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Ed Kinkeade |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-03327 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Dec 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 25, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 05, 2018 4:38 AM CDT |
Defendant
DePuy International Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson International
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DePuy Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Services Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cathleen J Globis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael J Globis
|
Represented By
|
Special Master
Special Master
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, February 25, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Stipulation
Fri 02/25 8:42 AM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL With Prejudice by Daniel R Hanson, Karen M Hanson, Doris Hinchcliffe, Edward Hinchcliffe, Bernard Abrahamson, Nancy Abrahamson, John Howe, Rachel M Howe, Diane K. Meissner, Cathleen J Globis, Michael J Globis, Peter J Tsoupeis, George Towler, Jay L Ernst, Donna Trevathan, Theresa Ostby, Julie Risty, Roger R Risty, Anna Neulin, Andrew Perrigo, Linda Dingle, Gregory Easler. (Nemo, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Optional)
Fri 02/25 10:34 AM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the Stipulation of Dismissal. (chmb) |
||
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/06 8:14 PM
Notice of filing Case Management Orders The following orders have been filed in 3:11-md-2244 and are available by using the links provided below. [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #10 ] [LINK:PINNACLE PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM] [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #11 ] [LINK:DEFENDANTS' FACT SHEET.] (cea) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 02/20 1:04 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to DePuy Inc. Waiver sent on 12/20/2017; DePuy International Limited. Waiver sent on 12/20/2017; DePuy Orthopaedics Inc. Waiver sent on 12/20/2017; Johnson & Johnson. Waiver sent on 12/20/2017; Johnson & Johnson International. Waiver sent on 12/20/2017; Johnson & Johnson Services Inc. Waiver sent on 12/20/2017. (Nemo, Anthony) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 12/07 4:13 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Cathleen J Globis, Michael J Globis. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8850404) Clerk to issue summons(es). Filer indicates this case is related to MDL Case No. 2244, In re: DePuy Orthopedics, Inc., Pinnacle Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, pending before Judge Ed Kinkeade. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Raso, Ashleigh) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Interested Persons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Notice of Related Case |